Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8960023 | Global Dossier | 24.02.2015 | B2 | US2012227515 | 13.09.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161490372 | 26.05.2011 | GB201103861 | 07.03.2011 | US201113338745 | 28.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2488789 | 06.11.2013 | B | GB2488789 | 12.09.2012 | A | GB201103861D0 | 20.04.2011 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201103861 | 07.03.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102680215B | Global Dossier | 22.04.2015 | B | CN102680215 | 19.09.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161490372 | 26.05.2011 | GB201103861 | 07.03.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2522975 | Global Dossier | 03.02.2021 | B1 | EP2522975 | 20.07.2016 | A3 | EP2522975 | 14.11.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201161490372 | 26.05.2011 | GB201103861 | 07.03.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2859633T | 04.10.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201161490372 | 26.05.2011 | GB201103861 | 07.03.2011 |