EP2522975 - A wind turbine blade tester [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.07.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vestas Wind Systems A/S Hedeager 42 8200 Aarhus N / DK | [2015/23] |
Former [2012/46] | For all designated states Vestas Wind Systems A/S Hedeager 44 8200 Aarhus N / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guy, Stuart Merrytrees Cottage Mount Lane Lockerley, hampshire SO51 0JS / GB | 02 /
Erskine, Tim 29 Sylvan Drive Newport, PO30 5QR / GB | [2012/46] | Representative(s) | Vestas Patents Department Hedeager 42 8200 Aarhus N / DK | [2021/05] | Application number, filing date | 11195348.5 | 22.12.2011 | [2012/46] | Priority number, date | GB20110003861 | 07.03.2011 Original published format: GB 201103861 | US201161490372P | 26.05.2011 Original published format: US 201161490372 P | [2012/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2522975 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2522975 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2522975 | Date: | 03.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01M7/08, F03D17/00, G01M5/00, G01M7/02, G01M7/06 | [2020/27] | CPC: |
G01M7/027 (EP,US);
G01N3/36 (GB);
F03D17/00 (EP,US);
F03D80/00 (GB);
G01M5/0016 (EP,GB,US);
G01M5/0033 (EP,US);
G01M5/0058 (EP,US);
G01M5/0066 (EP,US);
G01M5/0075 (EP,US);
G01M7/06 (EP,US);
G01M7/08 (EP,US);
G01N3/38 (GB);
|
Former IPC [2012/46] | G01M7/02, G01M7/06, G01M5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/09] |
Former [2012/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Windturbinenschaufeltester | [2012/46] | English: | A wind turbine blade tester | [2012/46] | French: | Testeur de pale d'éolienne | [2012/46] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2011 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/09] | 15.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.07.2019 | Opposition(s) | 04.11.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2011 | AL | 03.02.2021 | AT | 03.02.2021 | CY | 03.02.2021 | CZ | 03.02.2021 | DK | 03.02.2021 | EE | 03.02.2021 | FI | 03.02.2021 | HR | 03.02.2021 | IT | 03.02.2021 | LT | 03.02.2021 | LV | 03.02.2021 | MC | 03.02.2021 | MK | 03.02.2021 | MT | 03.02.2021 | NL | 03.02.2021 | PL | 03.02.2021 | RO | 03.02.2021 | RS | 03.02.2021 | SE | 03.02.2021 | SI | 03.02.2021 | SK | 03.02.2021 | SM | 03.02.2021 | BG | 03.05.2021 | NO | 03.05.2021 | GR | 04.05.2021 | IS | 03.06.2021 | PT | 04.06.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 22.12.2011 | |
AL | 03.02.2021 | ||
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CY | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
IT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
MC | 03.02.2021 | ||
MK | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SI | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 22.12.2011 | |
AL | 03.02.2021 | ||
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CY | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
IT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
MC | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SI | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CY | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
IT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
MC | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SI | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
IT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
MC | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SI | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
IT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SI | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SI | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 03.02.2021 | |
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 03.02.2021 | |
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 03.02.2021 | |
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2009097049 (ALLIANCE SUSTAINABLE ENERGY [US], et al); | [XDA]WO2009097055 (ALLIANCE SUSTAINABLE ENERGY [US], et al) | by applicant | US2006037402 | WO2009097055 |