EP2608411 - Switching circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2013/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Farnsworth, Tim Luke NXP Semiconductors, IP & L Betchworth House 57-65 Station Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | [2013/26] | Representative(s) | Miles, John Richard NXP SEMICONDUCTORS Intellectual Property Group Abbey House 25 Clarendon Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1QZ / GB | [2020/11] |
Former [2013/26] | Crawford, Andrew NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property and Licensing Red Central 60 High Street Redhill, Surrey RH1 1SH / GB | Application number, filing date | 11195388.1 | 22.12.2011 | [2013/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2608411 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2608411 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H03K19/003, H03K19/017 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
H03K19/01707 (EP,US);
H03K19/00361 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/11] |
Former [2013/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Schaltkreis | [2013/26] | English: | Switching circuit | [2013/26] | French: | Circuit de commutation | [2013/26] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2013 | Examination requested [2013/50] | 13.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.03.2018 | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2011 | AL | 11.03.2020 | AT | 11.03.2020 | CY | 11.03.2020 | CZ | 11.03.2020 | DK | 11.03.2020 | EE | 11.03.2020 | ES | 11.03.2020 | FI | 11.03.2020 | HR | 11.03.2020 | IT | 11.03.2020 | LT | 11.03.2020 | LV | 11.03.2020 | MC | 11.03.2020 | MK | 11.03.2020 | MT | 11.03.2020 | NL | 11.03.2020 | PL | 11.03.2020 | RO | 11.03.2020 | RS | 11.03.2020 | SE | 11.03.2020 | SI | 11.03.2020 | SK | 11.03.2020 | SM | 11.03.2020 | TR | 11.03.2020 | BG | 11.06.2020 | NO | 11.06.2020 | GR | 12.06.2020 | IS | 11.07.2020 | PT | 05.08.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 22.12.2011 | |
AL | 11.03.2020 | ||
AT | 11.03.2020 | ||
CY | 11.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
MT | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
TR | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 22.12.2011 | |
AT | 11.03.2020 | ||
CY | 11.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
MT | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
TR | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 11.03.2020 | |
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
TR | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 11.03.2020 | |
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 11.03.2020 | |
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 11.03.2020 | |
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 11.03.2020 | |
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 11.03.2020 | |
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 11.03.2020 | |
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
NO | 11.06.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0086090 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,6,9,13,15 * abstract * * page 1, lines 34,35 * * page 2, line 37 - page 3, line 9 * * page 5, line 25 - page 9, line 33 * [A] 2-4,12; | [A]EP0279332 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-5,12-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 19 - line 42 * * column 2, line 21 - line 25 * * column 2, line 39 - line 52 * * column 4, line 10 - column 6, line 2 *; | [XA]WO0205427 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [X] 1,4,6,15 * abstract * * page 2, line 7 - line 26 * * page 3, line 7 - page 5, line 14 * [A] 3,8,12,13; | [A]US6363029 (WATANABE TAKAO [JP], et al) [A] 1-5,7,8,10,13,15 * figures 7a,7b,11a,11b,21,34 * * column 8, line 31 - column 9, line 12 ** column 17, line 50 - column 18, line 16 *; | [A]WO2007072398 (NXP BV [NL], et al) [A] 1,3,4,8,9,12-15 * figures 5,6,7 * * page 5, line 1 - line 9 * * page 4, line 13 - line 19 * * page 5, line 3 - line 10 * * page 6, line 1 - line 17 * |