EP2512014 - Linear actuator particularly for sliding doors and for sliding door or window closure elements in general [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Topp S.p.A. A Socio Unico Via Galvani, 59 36066 Sandrigo, VI / IT | [2012/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cavalcante, Toni Via 25 Aprile, 3 36031 Dueville VI / IT | [2012/42] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/42] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano & Partners (IT) Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 11195400.4 | 22.12.2011 | [2012/42] | Priority number, date | IT2011PD00127 | 15.04.2011 Original published format: IT PD20110127 | [2012/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2512014 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2512014 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H02K41/02, H02K16/00, E05F15/18 | [2012/42] | CPC: |
H02K41/02 (EP,US);
E05F15/60 (EP,US);
H02K16/00 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/10 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/11 (EP,US);
E05Y2800/37 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/42] | Title | German: | Linearantrieb insbesondere für Schiebetüren, oder für Tür- oder Fensterschliesselemente | [2012/42] | English: | Linear actuator particularly for sliding doors and for sliding door or window closure elements in general | [2012/42] | French: | Actionneur linéaire en particulier pour portes coulissantes, ou pour des éléments de fermeture de portes ou de fenêtres | [2012/42] | Examination procedure | 28.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/07] | 26.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/38] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2011 | AL | 09.10.2013 | AT | 09.10.2013 | BE | 09.10.2013 | BG | 09.10.2013 | CY | 09.10.2013 | CZ | 09.10.2013 | DK | 09.10.2013 | EE | 09.10.2013 | ES | 09.10.2013 | FI | 09.10.2013 | HR | 09.10.2013 | LT | 09.10.2013 | LV | 09.10.2013 | MC | 09.10.2013 | MK | 09.10.2013 | MT | 09.10.2013 | NL | 09.10.2013 | PL | 09.10.2013 | RO | 09.10.2013 | RS | 09.10.2013 | SE | 09.10.2013 | SI | 09.10.2013 | SK | 09.10.2013 | SM | 09.10.2013 | TR | 09.10.2013 | IE | 22.12.2013 | LU | 22.12.2013 | NO | 09.01.2014 | GR | 10.01.2014 | IS | 09.02.2014 | PT | 10.02.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 22.12.2011 | |
AT | 09.10.2013 | ||
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
BG | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
MK | 09.10.2013 | ||
MT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
RS | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
SM | 09.10.2013 | ||
TR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IE | 22.12.2013 | ||
LU | 22.12.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
GR | 10.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | HU | 22.12.2011 | |
AT | 09.10.2013 | ||
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
BG | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
MK | 09.10.2013 | ||
MT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
RS | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
SM | 09.10.2013 | ||
IE | 22.12.2013 | ||
LU | 22.12.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
GR | 10.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/41] | HU | 22.12.2011 | |
AT | 09.10.2013 | ||
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
BG | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
GR | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
MK | 09.10.2013 | ||
MT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
RS | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
SM | 09.10.2013 | ||
IE | 22.12.2013 | ||
LU | 22.12.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | HU | 22.12.2011 | |
AT | 09.10.2013 | ||
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
BG | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
GR | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
MK | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
RS | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
SM | 09.10.2013 | ||
IE | 22.12.2013 | ||
LU | 22.12.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 22.12.2011 | |
AT | 09.10.2013 | ||
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
BG | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
MK | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
RS | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
SM | 09.10.2013 | ||
IE | 22.12.2013 | ||
LU | 22.12.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
MK | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
RS | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
SM | 09.10.2013 | ||
IE | 22.12.2013 | ||
LU | 22.12.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/31] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
RS | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
SM | 09.10.2013 | ||
IE | 22.12.2013 | ||
LU | 22.12.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
RS | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
IE | 22.12.2013 | ||
LU | 22.12.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
RS | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
IE | 22.12.2013 | ||
LU | 22.12.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
RS | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
LU | 22.12.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
RS | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
LU | 22.12.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RS | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RS | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RS | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RS | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RS | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 09.10.2013 | |
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 09.10.2013 | |
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 09.10.2013 | |
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/12] | SI | 09.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010139172 (BUSCH SVEN [DE]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]WO2009116343 (YASKAWA DENKI SEISAKUSHO KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]JP2005253194 (YASKAWA ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]WO2009062834 (TOPP S P A [IT], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]DE19641879 (BRANDSTETTER HEINZ PETER [AT]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * | by applicant | WO2009062834 |