EP2472044 - Window and/or blind frame for a window, door or similar [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.08.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHÜCO International KG Karolinenstrasse 1 - 15 33609 Bielefeld / DE | [2022/10] |
Former [2012/27] | For all designated states SCHÜCO International KG Karolinenstrasse 1 - 15 33609 Bielefeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leistner, Andreas Alleestr. 59 33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE | [2012/27] | Representative(s) | Kleine, Hubertus, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [2019/04] |
Former [2012/27] | Kleine, Hubertus, et al Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 11195684.3 | 23.12.2011 | [2012/27] | Priority number, date | DE20102013227U | 29.12.2010 Original published format: DE 202010013227 U | [2012/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2472044 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2472044 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2472044 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/04] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2472044 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/263 | [2012/27] | CPC: |
E06B3/26301 (EP);
E06B3/26303 (EP);
E06B2003/2633 (EP);
E06B2003/26332 (EP);
E06B2003/26389 (EP);
E06B2003/6244 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/22] |
Former [2012/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Flügel- und/oder Blendrahmen eines Fensters, einer Tür oder dergleichen | [2012/27] | English: | Window and/or blind frame for a window, door or similar | [2012/27] | French: | Chambranle et/ou dormant d'une fenêtre, d'une porte ou analogue | [2021/14] |
Former [2012/27] | Chambranle et/ou dormant d'une fenêtre, d'une porte ou analogue | Examination procedure | 15.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/22] | 05.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.08.2017 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.10.2019
ADMISSIBLE HUECK System GmbH & Co. KG Loherstrasse 9 58511 Lüdenscheid / DE Opponent's representative Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [2019/47] | 07.11.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.03.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.02.2021 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.02.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.06.2021 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 24.06.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 28.01.2022 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.12.2011 | AL | 23.01.2019 | CY | 23.01.2019 | CZ | 23.01.2019 | DK | 23.01.2019 | EE | 23.01.2019 | ES | 23.01.2019 | FI | 23.01.2019 | HR | 23.01.2019 | LT | 23.01.2019 | LV | 23.01.2019 | MC | 23.01.2019 | MK | 23.01.2019 | MT | 23.01.2019 | NL | 23.01.2019 | PL | 23.01.2019 | RO | 23.01.2019 | RS | 23.01.2019 | SE | 23.01.2019 | SI | 23.01.2019 | SK | 23.01.2019 | SM | 23.01.2019 | TR | 23.01.2019 | BG | 23.04.2019 | NO | 23.04.2019 | GR | 24.04.2019 | IS | 23.05.2019 | PT | 23.05.2019 | AT | 23.12.2019 | IE | 23.12.2019 | LU | 23.12.2019 | CH | 31.12.2019 | LI | 31.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 23.12.2011 | |
AL | 23.01.2019 | ||
CY | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
MT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
AT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IE | 23.12.2019 | ||
LU | 23.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 23.12.2011 | |
AL | 23.01.2019 | ||
CY | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
AT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IE | 23.12.2019 | ||
LU | 23.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CY | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
AT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IE | 23.12.2019 | ||
LU | 23.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
IE | 23.12.2019 | ||
LU | 23.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
IE | 23.12.2019 | ||
LU | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 23.01.2019 | |
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 23.01.2019 | |
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 23.01.2019 | |
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 23.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19622278 (GARTNER & CO J [DE]) [X] 1 * figure 1 *; | [Y]DE29809323U (GOETZ METALL ANLAGEN [DE]) [Y] 4 * page 7, paragraph 2 - page 8, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 *; | [YA]DE29817976U (SCHUECO INT KG [DE]) [Y] 5,7 * figure 1 *[A] 6; | [XY]DE10326503 (RAICO BAUTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,6 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027]; figure 7 * [Y] 4,5,7; | [XI]EP1932998 (ALCOA ALUMINIUM DEUTSCHLAND IN [DE]) [X] 1 * figure 3 * [I] 5 | Opposition | CH678747 | FR2725753 | DE19622278 | DE29809323U | DE29817976U | DE20219796U | DE10326503 | DE202005004338U | DE102006061655 | EP1932998 | US2010175339 | - Gutmann-Katalog, (20100300), pages 1 - 166, XP0155649976 | - Gutmann-Katalog, (20100300), pages 1 - 166 | - Auszug aus dem Katalog 'Hueck & Hartmann - Fassaden', Stand 5/2004 |