Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013097924 | Global Dossier | 04.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11195799 | 27.12.2011 | US201161581141 | 29.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9456417 | Global Dossier | 27.09.2016 | B2 | US2015223171 | 06.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11195799 | 27.12.2011 | WO2012EP05105 | 11.12.2012 | US201214367597 | 11.12.2012 | US201161581141 | 29.12.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2611257 | Global Dossier | 03.08.2016 | B1 | EP2611257 | 03.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11195799 | 27.12.2011 |