EP2609952 - Bruiseless cannula [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Q-Med AB Seminariegatan 21 752 28 Uppsala / SE | [2013/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Törnsten, Jonas Seminariegatan 21 752 28 Uppsala / SE | [2013/27] | Representative(s) | Nilsson, Lars Awapatent AB Studiegången 3 Box 665 831 40 Östersund / SE | [2013/27] | Application number, filing date | 11196145.4 | 30.12.2011 | [2013/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2609952 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2609952 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/32, A61M5/46 | [2013/27] | CPC: |
A61M5/3286 (EP,US);
A61M5/3287 (US);
A61M5/329 (EP,US);
A61M5/347 (US);
A61M5/46 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3267 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/27] | Title | German: | Blauer fleck-freie Kanüle | [2013/27] | English: | Bruiseless cannula | [2013/27] | French: | Canule sans pinçon | [2013/27] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2013 | Examination requested [2013/52] | 11.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.12.2011 | AL | 14.01.2015 | AT | 14.01.2015 | BE | 14.01.2015 | CY | 14.01.2015 | CZ | 14.01.2015 | DK | 14.01.2015 | EE | 14.01.2015 | FI | 14.01.2015 | HR | 14.01.2015 | LT | 14.01.2015 | LV | 14.01.2015 | MC | 14.01.2015 | MK | 14.01.2015 | MT | 14.01.2015 | NL | 14.01.2015 | PL | 14.01.2015 | PT | 14.01.2015 | RO | 14.01.2015 | RS | 14.01.2015 | SI | 14.01.2015 | SK | 14.01.2015 | SM | 14.01.2015 | TR | 14.01.2015 | BG | 14.04.2015 | NO | 14.04.2015 | GR | 15.04.2015 | IS | 14.05.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 30.12.2011 | |
AT | 14.01.2015 | ||
BE | 14.01.2015 | ||
CY | 14.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
MK | 14.01.2015 | ||
MT | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PT | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
SM | 14.01.2015 | ||
TR | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 30.12.2011 | |
AT | 14.01.2015 | ||
BE | 14.01.2015 | ||
CY | 14.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
MT | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
SM | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
BE | 14.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
BE | 14.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 14.01.2015 | |
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 14.01.2015 | |
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 14.01.2015 | |
NO | 14.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1527291 (GUILLERMO ZORRAQUIN) [Y] 2 * the whole document *; | [XYI]GB624269 (SYED ANWER HOSSAIN) [X] 1,3,5,6,8-16 * the whole document * [Y] 2,4 [I] 7; | [XYI]US3840008 (NOILES D) [X] 1,3,5,6,8-16 * abstract * [Y] 2,4 [I] 7; | [XYI]US5098389 (CAPPUCCI PATRICK J [US]) [X] 1,3,5,6,8-16 * abstract * [Y] 2,4 [I] 7; | [Y]WO2004067068 (ALZA CORP [US]) [Y] 2,4 * paragraph [0028]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO2005044116 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [A] 6* page 4, line 6 - page 5, line 30; figure -; claim 1 * |