EP2364913 - Brake test arrangement for an aircraft actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goodrich Actuation Systems Limited Stratford Road Solihull B90 4LA / GB | [2015/48] |
Former [2011/37] | For all designated states Goodrich Actuation Systems Limited Stratford Road Solihull B90 4LA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Whatley, Mark 70 Westland Drive Lee-on-the-Solent Gosport Hampshire PO13 8GJ / GB | [2011/37] | Representative(s) | Hall, Matthew Benjamin, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2015/48] |
Former [2013/35] | Hall, Matthew Benjamin, et al Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2013/33] | Leckey, David Herbert, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2011/37] | Bailey, Richard Alan Marks & Clerk LLP 27 Imperial Square Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1RQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11250241.4 | 02.03.2011 | [2011/37] | Priority number, date | GB20100004030 | 11.03.2010 Original published format: GB 201004030 | [2012/19] |
Former [2011/37] | GB20100004030 | 11.03.2010 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2364913 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2364913 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2364913 | Date: | 25.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/88, B26B21/14, B60T8/17, B64F5/00 | [2015/23] | CPC: |
B26B21/14 (EP,US);
B60T8/1703 (EP,US);
B60T8/885 (EP,US);
B64F5/60 (EP,US);
B60T2270/406 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/52] | B64F5/00, G01N19/02, B60T17/22 | ||
Former IPC [2011/37] | B64F5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/48] |
Former [2011/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Bremstestanordnung für einen Flugzeugaktuator | [2011/37] | English: | Brake test arrangement for an aircraft actuator | [2011/37] | French: | Agencement de test de freins pour actionner d'aéronef | [2015/23] |
Former [2011/37] | Agencement de test de freins pour actionner d'aéronef | Examination procedure | 20.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/31] | 08.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.03.2011 | AL | 25.11.2015 | AT | 25.11.2015 | BE | 25.11.2015 | BG | 25.11.2015 | CY | 25.11.2015 | CZ | 25.11.2015 | DK | 25.11.2015 | EE | 25.11.2015 | ES | 25.11.2015 | FI | 25.11.2015 | HR | 25.11.2015 | LT | 25.11.2015 | LV | 25.11.2015 | MC | 25.11.2015 | MK | 25.11.2015 | NL | 25.11.2015 | PL | 25.11.2015 | RO | 25.11.2015 | RS | 25.11.2015 | SE | 25.11.2015 | SI | 25.11.2015 | SK | 25.11.2015 | SM | 25.11.2015 | TR | 25.11.2015 | NO | 25.02.2016 | GR | 26.02.2016 | IE | 02.03.2016 | LU | 02.03.2016 | IS | 25.03.2016 | PT | 25.03.2016 | CH | 31.03.2016 | LI | 31.03.2016 | MT | 31.03.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 02.03.2011 | |
AT | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 25.11.2015 | ||
BG | 25.11.2015 | ||
CY | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
MK | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
TR | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IE | 02.03.2016 | ||
LU | 02.03.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 02.03.2011 | |
AT | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 25.11.2015 | ||
CY | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
MK | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
TR | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IE | 02.03.2016 | ||
LU | 02.03.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 02.03.2011 | |
AT | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 25.11.2015 | ||
CY | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
MK | 25.11.2015 | ||
MT | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IE | 02.03.2016 | ||
LU | 02.03.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
BE | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
MT | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IE | 02.03.2016 | ||
LU | 02.03.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
BE | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IE | 02.03.2016 | ||
LU | 02.03.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
BE | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
LU | 02.03.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
LU | 02.03.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
LU | 02.03.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 25.11.2015 | |
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 25.11.2015 | |
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 25.11.2015 | |
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 25.11.2015 | |
LT | 25.11.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1832860 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,11* paragraphs [0025] , [0036]; figure 3 *; | [A]WO2009083261 (AIRBUS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,11 * page 1, line 13 - page 2, line 8 * * page 7, line 18 - page 7, line 26; figure 1 *; | [A]US2010038493 (LANG DAVID J [US], et al) [A] 1,11 * paragraphs [0017] , [0027]; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US5097933 |