EP2389959 - Tissue adhesives and sealants and method of their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2012/52] |
Former [2011/48] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP Mail Stop: 8 N-1 555 Long Wharf Drive New Haven, CT 06511 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sargeant, Timothy 8234 Town Walk Drive Hamden, CT 06518 / US | 02 /
Stopek, Joshua 115 Denison Drive Guilford, CT 06437 / US | 03 /
Hadba, Ahmad Robert 12 High Meadow Lane Middlefield, CT 06455 / US | [2011/48] | Representative(s) | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/48] | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Edwards Wildman Innovations LLP 10 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11250556.5 | 26.05.2011 | [2011/48] | Priority number, date | US20100788933 | 27.05.2010 Original published format: US 788933 | [2011/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2389959 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2389959 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/22, A61L27/50, A61L31/04, A61L31/14 | [2011/48] | CPC: |
A61L27/227 (EP,US);
A61L24/0031 (EP,US);
A61L24/108 (EP,US);
A61L27/50 (EP,US);
A61L31/047 (EP,US);
A61L31/14 (EP,US);
C09J189/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Gewebeklebstoffe und -versiegelungsmittel und Verfahren zu deren Anwendung | [2011/48] | English: | Tissue adhesives and sealants and method of their use | [2011/48] | French: | Adhésifs et produits d'étanchéité pour tissus et leur procédé d'utilisation | [2011/48] | Examination procedure | 23.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/45] | 01.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007202075 (HADBA AHMAD R [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0013] - [0017] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraphs [0020] - [0030] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraphs [0040] - [0045]; example -; claim - *; | [A]WO03000433 (ACCELR8 TECHNOLOGY CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6638508 | US6632929 | US4978336 | US4361055 | US4979942 | US4359049 | US4874368 | US5368563 | US6527749 | US20070712333 | US20060777297 |