EP2393167 - Connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2019 | Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hosiden Corporation 4-33, Kitakyuhoji 1-chome Yao-shi, Osaka 581-0071 / JP | [2011/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawakami, Yuta Hosiden Corporation 4-33, Kitakyuhoji 1-chome Yao-shi Osaka 581-0071 / JP | 02 /
Nagata, Takayuki Hosiden Corporation 4-33, Kitakyuhoji 1-chome Yao-shi Osaka 581-0071 / JP | [2011/49] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/49] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 11250560.7 | 26.05.2011 | [2011/49] | Priority number, date | JP20100125755 | 01.06.2010 Original published format: JP 2010125755 | [2011/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2393167 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2393167 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/6473, H01R13/6593 | [2011/49] | CPC: |
H01R13/6473 (EP,US);
H01R13/658 (KR);
H01R13/6581 (KR);
H01R13/6582 (KR);
H01R13/6583 (KR);
H01R13/6584 (KR);
H01R13/6585 (KR);
H01R13/6586 (KR);
H01R13/6587 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Steckverbinder | [2011/49] | English: | Connector | [2011/49] | French: | Connecteur | [2011/49] | Examination procedure | 04.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/42] | 31.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.07.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0608813 (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [X] 1-11 * figures 1, 5, 8 * * column 3, lines 2-25 *; | [X]US2010099299 (MORIYAMA SATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-11 * figure 8 * * paragraph [0088] *; | [X]US7695318 (WANG FANG-HONG [TW], et al) [X] 1-11 * figure 4 *; | [A]US7270571 (HUANG CHING-YUAN [TW], et al) [A] 1-11 * figure 6 *; | [AD]JP2009181733 (JAPAN AVIATION ELECTRON) [AD] 1-11 * paragraph [0065] * | by applicant | JP2009181733 |