EP2506295 - Bonding apparatus and bonding method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apic Yamada Corporation 90 Ooaza Kamitokuma, Togura-machi Hanishina-gun Nagano 389-0898 / JP | [2012/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Kazuhiko, @ Apic Yamada Corporation 90, Ooaza Kamitokuma Chikuma-shi, Nagano 389-0898 / JP | [2012/40] | Representative(s) | Bailey, Sam Rogerson, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/40] | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 11250676.1 | 27.07.2011 | [2012/40] | Priority number, date | JP20110069344 | 28.03.2011 Original published format: JP 2011069344 | JP20110099610 | 27.04.2011 Original published format: JP 2011099610 | [2012/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2506295 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2506295 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/67, H01L21/60 | [2015/27] | CPC: |
H01L24/75 (EP,KR,US);
H01L24/81 (EP,KR,US);
H01L24/83 (EP,KR,US);
H01L24/92 (EP,KR,US);
H01L24/95 (EP,KR,US);
H01L2224/16225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73204 (EP,KR,US);
H01L2224/75102 (EP,US);
H01L2224/75252 (EP,KR,US);
H01L2224/753 (EP,US);
H01L2224/75313 (EP,US);
H01L2224/75315 (EP,KR,US);
H01L2224/75317 (EP,US);
H01L2224/7532 (EP,US);
H01L2224/755 (EP,US);
H01L2224/75502 (EP,US);
H01L2224/75704 (EP,US);
H01L2224/75755 (EP,US);
H01L2224/75756 (EP,US);
H01L2224/75804 (EP,KR,US);
H01L2224/7598 (EP,US);
H01L2224/75984 (EP,US);
H01L2224/81048 (EP,US);
H01L2224/8109 (EP,US);
H01L2224/81093 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83048 (EP,US);
H01L2224/8309 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83093 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83855 (EP,KR,US);
H01L2224/9211 (EP,KR,US);
H01L2224/95093 (EP,US);
H01L2224/97 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01005 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01019 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01074 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01082 (EP,US);
H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/73204, H01L2224/16225, H01L2224/32225, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/07802, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/15787, H01L2924/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/40] | H01L21/67 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/06] |
Former [2012/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Haftvorrichtung und Haftverfahren | [2012/40] | English: | Bonding apparatus and bonding method | [2012/40] | French: | Appareil de liaison et procédé de liaison | [2012/40] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/06] | 08.09.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5800667 (KOSAKI KATSUYA [JP], et al) [X] 1,6 * figure 1 * * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 45 *; | [A]US2007231961 (TESHIROGI KAZUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraphs [0099] - [0167] *; | [A]JP2007294607 (SONY CHEM & INF DEVICE CORP) [A] 1-9* figures 3-7 and the associated text *; | [A]US2009291524 (TAKAHASHI YOSHIMI [JP]) [A] 1-9 * figures 1-5 and the associated text * | by applicant | JP2000100837 |