EP2446832 - Modular suture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2012/52] |
Former [2012/18] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP Mailstop 8 N-1 555 Long Wharf Drive New Haven, CT 06511 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Primavera, Michael 433 Dogwood Road Orange, CT 06477 / US | 02 /
Okoniewski, Gregory G. 11 Benedict Drive North Haven, CT 06473 / US | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Edwards Wildman Innovations LLP 20 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 11250772.8 | 09.09.2011 | [2012/18] | Priority number, date | US20100914214 | 28.10.2010 Original published format: US 914214 | [2012/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2446832 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/06, // A61B17/00, A61B17/04 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
A61B17/06166 (EP,US);
A61B17/06066 (US);
A61B17/0401 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00477 (EP,US);
A61B2017/06028 (EP,US);
A61B2017/06057 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Modulare Wundnaht | [2012/18] | English: | Modular suture | [2012/18] | French: | Suture modulaire | [2012/18] | Examination procedure | 01.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.11.2012 | Examination requested [2012/50] | 31.07.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/36] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2591063 (HARRY GOLDBERG) [X] 1,2,5-10,12 * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 22 * * column 3, lines 38-45 * * figures 3,4 * [I] 11,13-15; | [XI]US6296659 (FOERSTER SETH [US]) [X] 1,2,5,7-9,12 * column 10, lines 25-60; figures 8,9 * [I] 11,13-15; | [XI]WO02080780 (COALESCENT SURGICAL INC [US], et al) [X] 1-10,12 * page 10, lines 7-13 * * page 20, line 30 - page 21, line 15 * * figures 1,10A,10C * [I] 11,13-15; | [XI]US2008154286 (ABBOTT RYAN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-9,12 * paragraphs [0086] - [0088] - [0098]; figure 5K * [I] 11,13-15; | [I]EP2108316 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US]) [I] 1-15* paragraphs [0018] , [0023] , [0024] , [0026]; figures 2A-C,4A-C *; | [X]US2010160961 (NAWROCKI JESSE G [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-15 * paragraphs [0062] , [0063] , [0065] - [0069]; figures 5,6A,6B,7 * | by applicant | US2009210006 | US2009248070 | US2010063540 | US2010094337 |