EP2447142 - Saddle riding type vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/18] | Screen mounting structure for saddle riding type vehicle | ||
[2013/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo Miyazaki 107-8556 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo Miyazaki 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muto, Noriyuki c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
Kawatani, Shinji c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 03 /
Doi, Takashi c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Stevens, Jason Paul Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Stevens, Jason Paul Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 11250868.4 | 21.10.2011 | [2012/18] | Priority number, date | JP20100244308 | 29.10.2010 Original published format: JP 2010244308 | [2012/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2447142 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2447142 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2447142 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B62J17/04 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
B62J17/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/18] | Title | German: | Sattelfahrzeug | [2013/16] | English: | Saddle riding type vehicle | [2013/16] | French: | Véhicule de type à selle | [2013/16] |
Former [2012/18] | Scheibenmontagestruktur für ein Sattelfahrzeug | ||
Former [2012/18] | Screen mounting structure for saddle riding type vehicle | ||
Former [2012/18] | Structure de montage d'écran pour véhicule du type monté à califourchon | Examination procedure | 18.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/14] | 19.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 08.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/29] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.10.2011 | AL | 07.08.2013 | AT | 07.08.2013 | BE | 07.08.2013 | BG | 07.08.2013 | CY | 07.08.2013 | CZ | 07.08.2013 | DK | 07.08.2013 | EE | 07.08.2013 | ES | 07.08.2013 | FI | 07.08.2013 | HR | 07.08.2013 | LT | 07.08.2013 | LV | 07.08.2013 | MC | 07.08.2013 | MK | 07.08.2013 | MT | 07.08.2013 | NL | 07.08.2013 | PL | 07.08.2013 | RO | 07.08.2013 | SE | 07.08.2013 | SI | 07.08.2013 | SK | 07.08.2013 | SM | 07.08.2013 | TR | 07.08.2013 | IE | 21.10.2013 | LU | 21.10.2013 | NO | 07.11.2013 | RS | 07.11.2013 | GR | 08.11.2013 | IS | 07.12.2013 | PT | 09.12.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/41] | HU | 21.10.2011 | |
AT | 07.08.2013 | ||
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
BG | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
MK | 07.08.2013 | ||
MT | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
SM | 07.08.2013 | ||
TR | 07.08.2013 | ||
IE | 21.10.2013 | ||
LU | 21.10.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
RS | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 21.10.2011 | |
AT | 07.08.2013 | ||
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
BG | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
MK | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
SM | 07.08.2013 | ||
TR | 07.08.2013 | ||
IE | 21.10.2013 | ||
LU | 21.10.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
RS | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
MK | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
SM | 07.08.2013 | ||
TR | 07.08.2013 | ||
IE | 21.10.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
SM | 07.08.2013 | ||
IE | 21.10.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
IE | 21.10.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 07.08.2013 | |
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 07.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JP2002284073 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [I] 1-7 * paragraphs [0011] - [0069]; figures 1-17 *; | [A]JPH04104086U (ANONYMOUS) [A] 1-7 * figures 1-2 * | by applicant | JP4119209B |