EP2439504 - Lifting apparatus and a method of using the same to indicate a load weight. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.10.2014 [2014/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adams, William Mark Sutton Lodge 33 Town Street Sutton-Cum-Lound Retford Nottinghamshire DN22 8PT / GB | [2012/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/15] | Representative(s) | Wood, Graham Bailey Walsh & Co LLP 1 York Place Leeds, LS1 2DR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | Wood, Graham Bailey Walsh & Co LLP 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD / GB | Application number, filing date | 11275121.9 | 10.10.2011 | [2012/15] | Priority number, date | GB20100017096 | 11.10.2010 Original published format: GB 201017096 | GB20110006190 | 12.04.2011 Original published format: GB 201106190 | [2012/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2439504 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2439504 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01G19/08, B66F9/04, B66F7/06, // G01G5/04 | [2013/39] | CPC: |
G01G19/083 (EP);
B65G69/24 (GB);
B66F7/08 (GB);
B66F7/28 (GB);
G01G19/02 (GB);
B65G2814/0344 (GB)
|
Former IPC [2012/15] | G01G19/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Hebevorrichtung und Verfahren zu deren Verwendung zur Anzeige eines Ladegewichts | [2012/15] | English: | Lifting apparatus and a method of using the same to indicate a load weight. | [2012/15] | French: | Appareil de levage et procédé d'utilisation de celui-ci pour indiquer le poids d'un corps | [2012/15] | Examination procedure | 23.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/10] | 26.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/40] | 02.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2014/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0032119 (HILLESHEIMER WALTER DIPL ING D); | [XI]WO9108977 (JENSEN BJOERN HOLGER [DK]); | [XI]JP2005062062 (TCM CORP); | [A]US2009095539 (PFOHL KEVIN L [US], et al) |