EP2472853 - Imaging device with ambient light sensing means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.10.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics (Grenoble 2) SAS 12, rue Jules Horowitz 38000 Grenoble / FR | For all designated states STMicroelectronics R&D Ltd Planar House, Parkway Globe Park Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/27] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics (Grenoble 2) SAS 12, Rue Jules Horowitz 38000 Grenoble / FR | ||
For all designated states STMicroelectronics R&D Ltd Planar House, Parkway Globe Park Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cellier, Alexandre 260, rue Saint Exupery 38420 Le Versoud / FR | 02 /
Deschamps, Benoit 3 Rue Lesdiguières 38360 Sassenage / FR | 03 /
Raynor, Jeffrey M. Ambridge Hall 17 West Catherine Place Edinburgh EH12 5HZ / GB | [2012/27] | Representative(s) | Marchand, André, et al Omnipat 610, chemin de Fabrègues 13510 Éguilles / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/27] | Marchand, André, et al OMNIPAT 24 Place des Martyrs de la Résistance 13100 Aix-en-Provence / FR | Application number, filing date | 11290002.2 | 03.01.2011 | [2012/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2472853 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/235, G03B7/099, G01J1/00 | [2012/27] | CPC: |
G03B7/0997 (EP,US);
H04N23/71 (EP,US);
H04N25/706 (EP);
G01J1/4204 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bildgebungsvorrichtung mit Mitteln zur Umgebungslichtmessung | [2012/27] | English: | Imaging device with ambient light sensing means | [2012/27] | French: | Dispositif d'imagerie doté d'un moyen de détection de lumière ambiante | [2012/27] | Examination procedure | 06.01.2011 | Examination requested [2012/27] | 04.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/47] | 11.07.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.01.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5122827 (SAEGUSA TAKASHI [JP], et al); | [Y]EP1133168 (SYMAGERY MICROSYSTEMS INC [CA]); | [Y]US2005218303 (POPLIN DWIGHT D [US]) |