blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2364972

EP2364972 - New method for synthesising ivabradine and its addition salts [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.07.2013
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip08.05.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
???moredetails.lapse.edited??? SM
published on 10.06.2015  [2015/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Les Laboratoires Servier
35, rue de Verdun
92284 Suresnes Cedex / FR
[2011/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Peglion, Jean-Louis
5, allée des Bégonias
78110 Le Vesinet / FR
02 / Caignard, Pascal
34, avenue Gallieni
93800 Epinay-sur-Seine / FR
 [2011/37]
Representative(s)(deleted)
[2011/37]
Application number, filing date11290091.516.02.2011
[2011/37]
Priority number, dateFR2010000065717.02.2010         Original published format: FR 1000657
[2011/37]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2364972
Date:14.09.2011
Language:FR
[2011/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2364972
Date:19.09.2012
Language:FR
[2012/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.07.2011
ClassificationIPC:C07D223/16, C07C235/74, C07C323/60
[2012/03]
CPC:
C07D223/16 (EP,KR,US); A61K31/55 (KR); A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP); A61P9/06 (EP); A61P9/10 (EP);
C07C235/74 (EP,US); C07C323/60 (EP,US); C07C2602/06 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2011/37]C07D223/16, A61K31/55, A61P9/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/37]
Extension statesBA02.03.2011
ME02.03.2011
TitleGerman:Neues Syntheseverfahren von Ivabradin und seinen addition Salzen[2011/37]
English:New method for synthesising ivabradine and its addition salts[2011/37]
French:"Nouveau procédé de synthese de l'Ivabradine et de ses sels d'Addition"[2011/37]
Examination procedure02.03.2011Examination requested  [2011/37]
30.08.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.09.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.04.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.08.2012Fee for grant paid
01.08.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.08.2011
Opposition(s)20.06.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/35]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSM19.09.2012
[2015/24]
Former [2014/09]deleted
Former [2013/52]CY19.09.2012
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2005110993  (SERVIER LAB [FR], et al) [A] 1-12 * claim 1 *;
 [A]WO2008146308  (IND SWIFT LAB LTD [IN], et al) [A] 1-12 * claim 1 *;
 [A]  - LAURA A MCALLISTER ET AL, "A Fluorous-Phase Pummerer Cyclative-Capture Strategy for the Synthesis of Nitrogen Heterocycles", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE. INTERNATIONAL EDITION, WILEY VCH VERLAG, WEINHEIM, vol. 44, no. 3, doi:10.1002/ANIE.200461930, ISSN 1433-7851, (20050107), pages 452 - 455, (20041229), XP007918373 [A] 1 * page 453; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.200461930
by applicantEP0534859
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.