EP2372296 - Kinetic energy penetrator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nexter Munitions 13 Route de la Minière 78000 Versailles / FR | [2011/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eches, Nicolas c/o Nexter Systems Service PVD 7 route de Guerry 18023 Bourges Cedex / FR | [2011/40] | Representative(s) | Célanie, Christian Cabinet Célanie 5 Avenue de Saint Cloud B.P. 214 78002 Versailles Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/40] | Célanie, Christian Cabinet Célanie 5 Avenue de Saint Cloud B.P. 214 78002 Versailles Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 11290134.3 | 16.03.2011 | [2011/40] | Priority number, date | FR20100001301 | 30.03.2010 Original published format: FR 1001301 | [2011/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2372296 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2372296 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F42B12/06, F42B12/08, F42B12/20 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
F42B12/06 (EP);
F42B12/08 (EP);
F42B12/204 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/40] | Title | German: | Wuchtgeschoss | [2011/40] | English: | Kinetic energy penetrator | [2011/40] | French: | Pénétrateur à énergie cinétique | [2011/40] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/19] | 18.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.03.2011 | AL | 29.05.2013 | AT | 29.05.2013 | CY | 29.05.2013 | CZ | 29.05.2013 | DK | 29.05.2013 | EE | 29.05.2013 | FI | 29.05.2013 | HR | 29.05.2013 | LT | 29.05.2013 | LV | 29.05.2013 | MC | 29.05.2013 | MK | 29.05.2013 | MT | 29.05.2013 | NL | 29.05.2013 | PL | 29.05.2013 | RO | 29.05.2013 | RS | 29.05.2013 | SI | 29.05.2013 | SK | 29.05.2013 | SM | 29.05.2013 | BG | 29.08.2013 | GR | 30.08.2013 | IS | 29.09.2013 | PT | 30.09.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 16.03.2011 | |
AT | 29.05.2013 | ||
CY | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
MK | 29.05.2013 | ||
MT | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
RS | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
SM | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 16.03.2011 | |
AT | 29.05.2013 | ||
CY | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
MT | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
RS | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
SM | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
CY | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
MT | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
RS | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
SM | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
MT | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
RS | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
SM | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MT | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
RS | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
SM | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MT | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
RS | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
RS | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
RS | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RS | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RS | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RS | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RS | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RS | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 29.05.2013 | |
PT | 30.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9930106 (LOCKHEED CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * page 3, line 29 - page 4, line 24 * * figure - * [Y] 4-10; | [XY]US6276277 (SCHMACKER BRUCE E [US]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * column 5, line 6 - line 26 * * figure - * [Y] 4-10; | [Y]US4573412 (LOVELACE DONALD E [US], et al) [Y] 4-10 * column 1, line 56 - line 64 * * figure - *; | [Y]DE3802002 (KALTMANN HANS JOACHIM [DE]) [Y] 9 * the whole document *; | [AP]US2010251921 (SIDDLE DAVID RICHARD [US], et al) [AP] 1 * abstract * * claim 2 *; | [A]EP1521052 (GIAT IND SA [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0965028 | EP1701131 | FR2622209 | EP0313484 | EP0349446 |