EP2607197 - Method and system for protecting passengers on a platform [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.12.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.01.2020 [2020/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens S.A.S. 9, boulevard Finot 93527 Saint-Denis Cedex 2 / FR | For all designated states Siemens Mobility GmbH Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2018/44] |
Former [2017/35] | For all designated states Siemens S.A.S. 9, boulevard Finot 93527 Saint-Denis Cedex 2 / FR | ||
For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | |||
Former [2014/35] | For all designated states Siemens S.A.S. 9, boulevard Finot 93527 Saint-Denis Cedex 2 / FR | ||
For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | |||
Former [2013/26] | For all designated states Siemens S.A.S. 9, Boulevard Finot 93200 St. Denis / FR | ||
For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bieg, Thomas Zugspitzstrasse 23 81541 München / DE | 02 /
Bode, Christian Holwedestr. 10 38118 Braunschweig / DE | 03 /
Bohe, Armand Pierre 15 Rue Auboin 92340 Bourg-La-Reine / FR | 04 /
Gimenez, Jean-Marie 7 Rue Galliéni 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | 05 /
Paul, Uwe Zum Vitiholz 11 38855 Wernigerode / DE | [2013/26] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/26] | Fischer, Michael Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11290588.0 | 21.12.2011 | [2013/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2607197 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B61B1/02 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
B61B1/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zum Schutz von Fahrgästen auf einer Plattform | [2013/26] | English: | Method and system for protecting passengers on a platform | [2013/26] | French: | Procédé et système de protection de passagers sur une plateforme | [2013/26] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/06] | 22.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/05] | 10.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/05] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.05.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2011150490 (SCREMIN FRANCO [CA]) [X] 1-8,10-12,15 * the whole document * [I] 9,13,14; | [XI]EP1717124 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5,8,10-12 * the whole document * [I] 6,7,9,13-15; | [X]US1612722 (JOSEPH HOFFAY) [X] 1-5,8-14 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2442054 (KNORR BREMSE RAIL SYSTEMS [GB]) [X] 1-7,10-12 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102009044843 (PINTSCH BAMAG AG [DE]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * |