EP2525304 - Radiofrequency transponder device with passive optimised resonant circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gemalto SA 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/47] | For all designated states Gemalto SA 6 Rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lahoui, Nizar 34A - Résidence Jardin des Potiers 13400 AUBAGNE / FR | 02 /
Buyukkalender, Arek 15, rue Paul Preboist 13013 MARSEILLE / FR | 03 /
Seban, Frédérick Bastide de l'Olivaie CD1 - Le Gibal 13260 CASSIS / FR | [2012/47] | Application number, filing date | 11305594.1 | 17.05.2011 | [2012/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2525304 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077 | [2012/47] | CPC: |
G06K19/07773 (EP,US);
G06K19/07749 (EP,US);
G06K19/07775 (EP,US);
G06K19/07794 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Funkfrequenz-Transpondervorrichtung mit optimiertem passivem Resonanzkreis | [2012/47] | English: | Radiofrequency transponder device with passive optimised resonant circuit | [2012/47] | French: | Dispositif transpondeur radiofréquence à circuit résonant passif optimisé | [2012/47] | Examination procedure | 22.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/47] | 28.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10293828 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO) [A] 1-12* figure 3 *; | [A]JP2001351084 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [XI]JP2002150245 (SAMSUNG SDS CO LTD, et al) [X] 1-5 * abstract * [I] 6-12; | [A]US2011063184 (FURUMURA YUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * figures 9, 15 * | by applicant | US5955723 | US6378774 |