EP2525361 - Lower nozzle for use in nuclear fuel assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AREVA NP Tour AREVA 1 Place Jean Millier 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/47] | For all designated states Areva NP Tour Areva 1 Place Jean Millier 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blavius, Dirk Pechmannstrasse 24 91058 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
Friedrich, Erhard Brander Haupstrasse 21 90542 Eckental / DE | 03 /
Meier, Werner Weingarts 230 91358 Kunreuth / DE | [2012/47] | Representative(s) | Domenego, Bertrand Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/47] | Domenego, Bertrand Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 11305616.2 | 20.05.2011 | [2012/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2525361 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G21C3/32, G21C3/33, // G21C3/322 | [2012/47] | CPC: |
G21C3/3206 (EP,US);
G21C3/32 (KR);
G21C3/322 (EP,KR,US);
G21C3/33 (KR);
G21C3/3305 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Untere Düse zur Verwendung in einem Kernbrennstoffbündel | [2012/47] | English: | Lower nozzle for use in nuclear fuel assembly | [2012/47] | French: | Embout inférieur pour assemblage de combustible nucléaire | [2012/47] | Examination procedure | 22.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/51] | 03.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/51] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4684495 (WILSON JOHN F [US], et al) [AD] 1-12 * abstract * * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 11 * * column 5, lines 50-65 * * column 6, lines 36-48 * * column 7, lines 20-53 *; | [A]US5347560 (LIPPERT HANS-JOACHIM [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * column 4, lines 17-25 * * column 5, lines 8-30 * * column 6, line 50 - column 7, line 13 *; | [A]US5030412 (YATES JACK [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * column 3, lines 17-63 * * column 5, lines 41-46 *; | [A]US2006283790 (ELKINS ROBERT B [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0039] , [0040] * | by applicant | US4684495 |