|
19.06.2019 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2018 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2018 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2018 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.07.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.2018 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.03.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.03.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
01.03.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
11.01.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.01.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.01.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.01.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.01.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2018 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.01.2018 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.01.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.01.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.01.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.01.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.01.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2017 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
31.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2017 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2016 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.11.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.11.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.09.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.09.2013 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.09.2013 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.07.2013 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.03.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.03.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.01.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.01.2013 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2013 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2012 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2012 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2011 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2011 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.09.2011 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.07.2011 |
Acknowledgement of receipt from National Office - R35(4) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2011 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2011 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
17.06.2011 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2011 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2011 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.06.2011 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |