01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
16.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
12.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.07.2020 [2020/29] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
09.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
21.06.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
10.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
03.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] |
26.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
19.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
22.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
08.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
01.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] |
25.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
18.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
11.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
13.07.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
10.07.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
06.07.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
06.07.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
16.06.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.02.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.01.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] |
19.01.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] |
12.01.2018 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
22.06.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.05.2017 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
25.11.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
14.06.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.06.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.04.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.09.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.07.2013 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.03.2013 |
Change - representative |
published on 01.05.2013 [2013/18] |
04.03.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.03.2013 |
First examination report |
|
25.01.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] |
18.12.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.12.2012 [2012/51] |
29.05.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|