EP2555156 - Image mosaicing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ST-Ericsson SA Chemin du Champ-des-Filles 39 1228 Plan-les-Ouates / CH | [2015/19] |
Former [2013/06] | For all designated states ST-Ericsson SA Chemin du Champ-des-Filles 39 1228 Plan-les-Ouates / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Drouot, Antoine 99 rue des Moines 75017 Paris / FR | [2013/06] | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/19] | Hirsch & Associés 137, rue de l'Université 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2013/06] | Hirsch & Associés 58, avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 11306020.6 | 05.08.2011 | [2013/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2555156 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2555156 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06T3/40 | [2013/06] | CPC: |
G06T3/4038 (EP,US);
G06T11/60 (US);
G06T7/223 (EP,US);
G06T2200/32 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10016 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/06] | Title | German: | Bildmosaikbildung | [2013/06] | English: | Image mosaicing | [2013/06] | French: | Mosaïcage d'images | [2015/03] |
Former [2013/06] | Présentation d'une image en mosaïque | Examination procedure | 27.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2012 | Examination requested [2013/06] | 16.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.08.2011 | AL | 06.05.2015 | AT | 06.05.2015 | BE | 06.05.2015 | CY | 06.05.2015 | CZ | 06.05.2015 | DK | 06.05.2015 | EE | 06.05.2015 | ES | 06.05.2015 | FI | 06.05.2015 | HR | 06.05.2015 | IT | 06.05.2015 | LT | 06.05.2015 | LV | 06.05.2015 | MC | 06.05.2015 | MK | 06.05.2015 | MT | 06.05.2015 | NL | 06.05.2015 | PL | 06.05.2015 | RO | 06.05.2015 | RS | 06.05.2015 | SE | 06.05.2015 | SI | 06.05.2015 | SK | 06.05.2015 | SM | 06.05.2015 | TR | 06.05.2015 | IE | 05.08.2015 | LU | 05.08.2015 | BG | 06.08.2015 | NO | 06.08.2015 | GR | 07.08.2015 | CH | 31.08.2015 | LI | 31.08.2015 | IS | 06.09.2015 | PT | 07.09.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 05.08.2011 | |
AT | 06.05.2015 | ||
BE | 06.05.2015 | ||
CY | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
MK | 06.05.2015 | ||
MT | 06.05.2015 | ||
NL | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SE | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
SM | 06.05.2015 | ||
TR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IE | 05.08.2015 | ||
LU | 05.08.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 05.08.2011 | |
AT | 06.05.2015 | ||
BE | 06.05.2015 | ||
CY | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
MT | 06.05.2015 | ||
NL | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SE | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
SM | 06.05.2015 | ||
TR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IE | 05.08.2015 | ||
LU | 05.08.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
BE | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
MT | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
IE | 05.08.2015 | ||
LU | 05.08.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
BE | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
IE | 05.08.2015 | ||
LU | 05.08.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
IE | 05.08.2015 | ||
LU | 05.08.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
LU | 05.08.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
LU | 05.08.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
LU | 05.08.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
LU | 05.08.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/17] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
LU | 05.08.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 06.05.2015 | |
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 06.05.2015 | |
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010020190 (KAWAKATSU YASUHIRO [JP], et al); | by applicant | WO9834195 | US2004057633 | WO2007122584 |