EP2562435 - Pre-stressed rolling bearing, notably for steering column [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aktiebolaget SKF 415 50 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states Aktiebolaget SKF 41 550 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lepine, Thomas 23 levée de la Loire Résidence La Closerie Saint Cosme - Appt. 36 37520 La Riche / FR | 02 /
Montboeuf, Bruno 14 rue des Commaillères 37390 Cerelles / FR | 03 /
Jansen, Daniel 2ter, rue des Oiseaux 37000 Tours / FR | 04 /
Bussit, Sylvain 227 Allée de la Louriotterie 37380 Monnaie / FR | [2013/09] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71-73 80335 München / DE | [2013/09] | Application number, filing date | 11306063.6 | 25.08.2011 | [2013/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2562435 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F16C19/16, F16C25/08, F16C27/06, F16C33/61, F16C33/60 | [2013/09] | CPC: |
F16C19/06 (EP);
F16C25/083 (EP);
F16C27/066 (EP);
F16C33/60 (EP);
F16C33/61 (EP);
F16C2326/24 (EP);
F16C2380/26 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorgespanntes Wälzlager, insbesondere für eine Lenksäule | [2013/09] | English: | Pre-stressed rolling bearing, notably for steering column | [2013/09] | French: | Roulement précontraint, particulièrement pour colonne de direction | [2013/09] | Examination procedure | 28.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/11] | 07.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]DE102005033566 (SCHAEFFLER KG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-8,13-16 * paragraphs [0001] , [0021] , [0023] * * figures 1,3 * [Y] 10,11 [I] 9,12; | [XYI]DE19807514 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER OHG [DE]) [X] 1-4,8,13-16 * page 3, line 17 - line 56 * * figure 2 * [Y] 10,11 [I] 9,12; | [YA]US2588636 (KORSGREN THEODORE Y) [Y] 10,11 * figures 1,3,4 * * column 2, line 14 - column 3, line 17 * [A] 1-3; | [A]DE19604036 (NADELLA [FR]) [A] 1-7,13,16 * figures 1,3,4,5 *; | [A]EP1956254 (SKF AB [SE]) [A] 1,2,14-16 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1200451 (ARNOT ALFRED E R) [A] 1,14,15 * page 2, line 60 - line 67 * * figures 5-9 * | by applicant | EP1956254 |