EP2595188 - Circuitry package [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.07.2014 [2014/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ST-Ericsson SA Chemin du Champ-des-Filles 39 1228 Plan-les-Ouates / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | For all designated states ST-Ericsson SA Chemin du Champ-des-Filles 39 1228 Plan-les-Ouates / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saint-Pierre, Jean-Marc 40 chemin de la source 28 les mas de la chenaie 06130 Grasse / FR | 02 /
Guillou, Yann 27, allée des romantiques 38100 Grenoble / FR | [2013/21] | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | Hirsch & Associés 58, avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 11306510.6 | 17.11.2011 | [2013/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2595188 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01L25/10, H01L25/065, H01L23/498 | [2013/21] | CPC: |
H01L25/03 (EP);
H01L23/49816 (EP);
H01L24/19 (EP);
H01L25/105 (EP);
H05K1/0225 (EP);
H05K1/0253 (EP);
H05K1/028 (EP);
H05K1/144 (EP);
H05K1/185 (EP);
H01L2224/12105 (EP);
H01L2224/131 (EP);
H01L2224/16225 (EP);
H01L2224/32145 (EP);
H01L2224/32225 (EP);
H01L2224/48227 (EP);
H01L2224/73204 (EP);
H01L2224/73265 (EP);
H01L2225/1035 (EP);
H01L2225/1058 (EP);
H01L24/73 (EP);
H01L2924/15311 (EP);
H01L2924/15331 (EP);
H01L2924/181 (EP);
H05K1/147 (EP);
H05K2201/09309 (EP);
H05K2201/09618 (EP);
H05K2201/09727 (EP);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/131, H01L2924/014 (EP);
H01L2224/73204, H01L2224/16225, H01L2224/32225, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32145, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00012 (EP);
H01L2924/15311, H01L2224/73204, H01L2224/16225, H01L2224/32225, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2924/15311, H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Schaltungspaket | [2013/21] | English: | Circuitry package | [2013/21] | French: | Paquet de circuit | [2013/21] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/30] | 21.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1612860 (SHINKO ELECTRIC IND CO [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0029]; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US2006175702 (ISHIBASHI KAZUO [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * figure 3 *; | [Y]US2010072599 (CAMACHO ZIGMUND R [SG], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0083]; figure 12 *; | [Y]US2010244219 (PAGAILA REZA ARGENTY [SG], et al) [Y] 1-15* figures 2-5 * |