EP2393173 - Electric cell with arrangement for dielectric cable test and earthing arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/49] | Device for dielectric testing of cables by injecting a voltage into said cable in an electric switchgear and electric cell comprising such a device | ||
[2012/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.12.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 35, rue Joseph Monier 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/49] | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 35 rue Joseph Monier 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Perrone, Michel Schneider Electric Industries SAS Sce Propriété Industrielle 38050 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | [2011/49] | Representative(s) | Colette, Marie-Françoise, et al Schneider Electric Industries SAS Propriété Industrielle 160 Avenue des Martyrs 38000 Grenoble / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/49] | Colette, Marie-Françoise, et al Schneider Electric Industries SAS Service Propriété Industrielle WTC - 38EE1 5, place Robert Schuman 38050 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 11354019.9 | 10.05.2011 | [2011/49] | Priority number, date | FR20100002344 | 03.06.2010 Original published format: FR 1002344 | [2011/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2393173 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2393173 | Date: | 13.02.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H02B11/28, // G01R1/02 | [2011/49] | CPC: |
H02B11/28 (EP);
G01R1/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/49] | Title | German: | Elektrische Zelle mit dielektrischer Kabeltestvorrichtung und Erdungsvorrichtung | [2012/31] | English: | Electric cell with arrangement for dielectric cable test and earthing arrangement | [2012/31] | French: | Cellule électrique avec dispositifs de test dielectrique des cables et mise à la terre | [2012/31] |
Former [2011/49] | Vorrichtung zur Durchführung eines dielektrischen Kabeltests durch Einspeisung einer Spannung in das entsprechende Kabel in einem Elektrogerät, und elektrische Zelle, die mit einer solchen Vorrichtung ausgestattet ist | ||
Former [2011/49] | Device for dielectric testing of cables by injecting a voltage into said cable in an electric switchgear and electric cell comprising such a device | ||
Former [2011/49] | Dispositif pour realiser un test dielectrique de cables par injection d'une tension sur ledit cable dans un appareillage electrique et cellule electrique comportant un tel dispositif | Examination procedure | 25.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/28] | 14.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.05.2011 | AL | 13.02.2013 | AT | 13.02.2013 | CY | 13.02.2013 | CZ | 13.02.2013 | DK | 13.02.2013 | EE | 13.02.2013 | FI | 13.02.2013 | HR | 13.02.2013 | LT | 13.02.2013 | LV | 13.02.2013 | MC | 13.02.2013 | MK | 13.02.2013 | MT | 13.02.2013 | PL | 13.02.2013 | RO | 13.02.2013 | RS | 13.02.2013 | SI | 13.02.2013 | SK | 13.02.2013 | SM | 13.02.2013 | TR | 13.02.2013 | IE | 10.05.2013 | LU | 10.05.2013 | BG | 13.05.2013 | NO | 13.05.2013 | GR | 14.05.2013 | BE | 31.05.2013 | IS | 13.06.2013 | PT | 13.06.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 10.05.2011 | |
AT | 13.02.2013 | ||
CY | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
MK | 13.02.2013 | ||
MT | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
RS | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
SM | 13.02.2013 | ||
TR | 13.02.2013 | ||
IE | 10.05.2013 | ||
LU | 10.05.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
CY | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
MK | 13.02.2013 | ||
MT | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
RS | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
SM | 13.02.2013 | ||
TR | 13.02.2013 | ||
IE | 10.05.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
CY | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
MT | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
RS | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
SM | 13.02.2013 | ||
IE | 10.05.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
MT | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
RS | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
SM | 13.02.2013 | ||
IE | 10.05.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
MT | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
RS | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
IE | 10.05.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
RS | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
IE | 10.05.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
RS | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
RS | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
RS | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RS | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/43] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RS | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | LT | 13.02.2013 | |
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 13.02.2013 | |
NO | 13.05.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3727109 (KOZLOVIC J) [A] 1,14 * abstract *; | [A]FR2786942 (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY [FR]) [A] 1,14 * abstract *; | [A]EP0176995 (PFISTERER ELEKTROTECH KARL [DE]) [A] 1,14 * abstract *; | [A]FR2640077 (ALSTHOM GEC [FR]) [A] 1,14 * abstract *; | [A]DE19633538 (DRIESCHER ELTECH WERK [DE]) [A] 1,14 * abstract * |