EP2463884 - Switchgear having a plurality of single-pole phase units and comprising a single mechanism for actuating said phase units [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2015 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 35, rue Joseph Monier 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [2015/03] |
Former [2012/24] | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 35 rue Joseph Monier 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grumel, Christophe Schneider Electric Industries SAS Sce Propriété Industrielle 38050 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | 02 /
Giraud, Denis Scheider Electric Industries SAS Sce Propriété Industrielle 38050 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | [2012/24] | Representative(s) | Picard, Laurent, et al Schneider Electric Industries SAS World Trade Center 38EE1 / Service Propriété Industrielle 5 Place Robert Schuman 38050 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | [2012/24] | Application number, filing date | 11354062.9 | 07.11.2011 | [2012/24] | Priority number, date | FR20100004834 | 13.12.2010 Original published format: FR 1004834 | [2012/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2463884 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2463884 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01H71/10 | [2012/24] | CPC: |
H01H71/1009 (EP,US);
H01H71/10 (KR);
H01H73/04 (KR);
H01H2071/1036 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/24] | Title | German: | Abschaltungsvorrichtung mit mehreren einpoligen Abschaltungsblocks und nur einem Betätigungsmechanismus dieser Blocks | [2012/24] | English: | Switchgear having a plurality of single-pole phase units and comprising a single mechanism for actuating said phase units | [2012/24] | French: | Dispositif de coupure ayant plusieurs blocs de coupure unipolaire et comportant un seul mécanisme d'actionnement desdits blocs | [2012/24] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/33] | 01.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.11.2011 | AL | 14.01.2015 | AT | 14.01.2015 | CY | 14.01.2015 | DK | 14.01.2015 | EE | 14.01.2015 | FI | 14.01.2015 | HR | 14.01.2015 | LT | 14.01.2015 | LV | 14.01.2015 | MC | 14.01.2015 | MK | 14.01.2015 | MT | 14.01.2015 | NL | 14.01.2015 | PT | 14.01.2015 | RO | 14.01.2015 | RS | 14.01.2015 | SE | 14.01.2015 | SI | 14.01.2015 | SK | 14.01.2015 | SM | 14.01.2015 | BG | 14.04.2015 | NO | 14.04.2015 | GR | 15.04.2015 | IS | 14.05.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 07.11.2011 | |
AT | 14.01.2015 | ||
CY | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
MK | 14.01.2015 | ||
MT | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PT | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
SM | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 07.11.2011 | |
AT | 14.01.2015 | ||
CY | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
MT | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
SM | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 14.01.2015 | |
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 14.01.2015 | |
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 14.01.2015 | |
NO | 14.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2891661 (LS IND SYSTEMS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1 * page 6 - page 12; figures 5-13 *; | [A]EP2148351 (LS IND SYSTEMS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0018] - [0030]; figures 2,3 *; | [AD]US2007075808 (AHN BYOUNG-SOO [KR]) [AD] 1 * paragraphs [0029] - [0036]; figures 5-11 * | by applicant | EP0540431 | US2007075808 | US2003098224 |