EP2479769 - Medium-voltage cutting device including a vacuum tube [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 35, rue Joseph Monier 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [2014/43] |
Former [2012/30] | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 35 rue Joseph Monier 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grosjean, Patrice Schneider Electric Industries SAS Sce Propriété Industrielle 38050 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | [2012/30] | Representative(s) | Péru, Laurence, et al Schneider Electric Industries SAS Service Propriété Industrielle WTC-38EE1 5 pl. Robert Schuman 38050 Grenoble Cédex 09 / FR | [2012/30] | Application number, filing date | 11354078.5 | 13.12.2011 | [2012/30] | Priority number, date | FR20110050576 | 25.01.2011 Original published format: FR 1150576 | [2012/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2479769 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2479769 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01H33/666, H01H33/12 | [2012/30] | CPC: |
H01H33/6661 (EP,US);
H01H33/126 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/30] | Title | German: | Mittelspannungs-Abschaltungsvorrichtung einschließlich einer Vakuumlampe | [2012/30] | English: | Medium-voltage cutting device including a vacuum tube | [2012/30] | French: | Dispositif de coupure moyenne tension comprenant une ampoule à vide | [2012/30] | Examination procedure | 20.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/14] | 07.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | 23.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/40] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees AL, MK, EE, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 15.03.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 15.03.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.03.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 15.03.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 15.03.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.03.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.12.2011 | AL | 22.10.2014 | AT | 22.10.2014 | BG | 22.10.2014 | CY | 22.10.2014 | CZ | 22.10.2014 | DK | 22.10.2014 | EE | 22.10.2014 | FI | 22.10.2014 | HR | 22.10.2014 | LT | 22.10.2014 | LV | 22.10.2014 | MC | 22.10.2014 | MK | 22.10.2014 | MT | 22.10.2014 | NL | 22.10.2014 | PL | 22.10.2014 | RO | 22.10.2014 | RS | 22.10.2014 | SE | 22.10.2014 | SI | 22.10.2014 | SK | 22.10.2014 | SM | 22.10.2014 | TR | 22.10.2014 | IE | 13.12.2014 | LU | 13.12.2014 | BE | 31.12.2014 | CH | 31.12.2014 | LI | 31.12.2014 | NO | 22.01.2015 | GR | 23.01.2015 | IS | 22.02.2015 | PT | 23.02.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 13.12.2011 | |
AT | 22.10.2014 | ||
BG | 22.10.2014 | ||
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
MK | 22.10.2014 | ||
MT | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
SM | 22.10.2014 | ||
TR | 22.10.2014 | ||
IE | 13.12.2014 | ||
LU | 13.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 13.12.2011 | |
AT | 22.10.2014 | ||
BG | 22.10.2014 | ||
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
MT | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
SM | 22.10.2014 | ||
TR | 22.10.2014 | ||
IE | 13.12.2014 | ||
LU | 13.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 13.12.2011 | |
AT | 22.10.2014 | ||
BG | 22.10.2014 | ||
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
SM | 22.10.2014 | ||
TR | 22.10.2014 | ||
IE | 13.12.2014 | ||
LU | 13.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
BG | 22.10.2014 | ||
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
SM | 22.10.2014 | ||
IE | 13.12.2014 | ||
LU | 13.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
SM | 22.10.2014 | ||
IE | 13.12.2014 | ||
LU | 13.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
SM | 22.10.2014 | ||
IE | 13.12.2014 | ||
LU | 13.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
IE | 13.12.2014 | ||
LU | 13.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
IE | 13.12.2014 | ||
LU | 13.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
IE | 13.12.2014 | ||
LU | 13.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
LU | 13.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
LU | 13.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
LU | 13.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 22.10.2014 | |
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 22.10.2014 | |
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 22.10.2014 | |
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 22.10.2014 | |
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 22.10.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2182536 (AREVA T & D SAS [FR]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0006] - [0010]; figure - *; | [A]WO2010136424 (AREVA T & D SAS [FR], et al) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]FR2675304 (GEC ALSTHOM ENGERGIE INC [CA]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 31 - page 6, line 33; figures 3-6 * | by applicant | US5168139 | FR2721434 | FR2937786 |