EP2586365 - Method for quantifying stress in a user [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.10.2014 [2014/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universidad Politécnica de Madrid C/ Ramiro de Maeztu 7 28040 Madrid / ES | [2013/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sánchez Ávila, Carmen UNIVERSIDAD POLITÉCNICA DE MADRID Ramiro de Maeztu, 7 E-28040 Madrid / ES | 02 /
De Santos Sierra, Alberto UNIVERSIDAD POLITÉCNICA DE MADRID OTRI-Vicerrectorado de nvestigación Ramiro de Maeztu, 7 E-28040 Madrid / ES | 03 /
Bailador del Pozo, Gonzalo UNIVERSIDAD POLITÉCNICA DE MADRID OTRI-Vicerrectorado de Investigación Ramiro de Maeztu, 7 E-28040 Madrid / ES | 04 /
Guerra Casanova, Javier UNIVERSIDAD POLITÉCNICA DE MADRID OTRI-Vicerrectorado de Investigación Ramiro de Maeztu, 7 E-28040 Madrid / ES | 05 /
Jara Vera, Vicente UNIVERSIDAD POLITÉCNICA DE MADRID OTRI-Vicerrectorado de Investigación Ramiro de Maeztu, 7 E-28040 Madrid / ES | [2013/18] | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | ABG Patentes, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 11382327.2 | 24.10.2011 | [2013/18] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2586365 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/02, A61B5/053 | [2013/18] | CPC: |
A61B5/02405 (EP);
A61B5/0533 (EP);
A61B5/4884 (EP);
A61B5/7282 (EP);
A61B5/7296 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Quantifizierung von Stress in einem Benutzer | [2013/18] | English: | Method for quantifying stress in a user | [2013/18] | French: | Procédé pour quantifier le stress d'un utilisateur | [2013/18] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2013 | Examination requested [2013/50] | 16.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/40] | 23.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.12.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]ES2361686 (UNIV MADRID POLITECNICA [ES], et al) [I] 1-5,8 * abstract *; | [A]US2002123704 (HORI KUNIHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1,8 * paragraphs [0049] - [0052]; figures 4-11; claims 1-13 *; | [A]US2010022852 (WESTERINK JOANNE HENRIETTE DESIREE MONIQUE [NL], et al) [A] 1,8 * paragraphs [0020] - [0034]; figures 1-3; claims 1-19 * |