EP2607495 - Method for detection of KRAS mutations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.06.2014 [2014/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genomica S.A.U. C/ Alcarria 7 Poligono Industrial de Coslada 28823 Coslada, Madrid / ES | [2013/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moscoso del Prado, Juan GENOMICA S.A.U. C/ Alcarria 7 Polígono Industrial de Coslada 28823 Coslada, Madrid / ES | 02 /
Villahermosa Jaen, María Luisa GENOMICA S.A.U. C/ Alcarria 7 Polígono Industrial de Coslada 28823 Coslada, Madrid / ES | [2013/26] | Representative(s) | Gascón Escobar, Irene Genomica S.A. Uniperonal C/ Alcarria 7 Polígono Industrial de Coslada 28823 Coslada, Madrid / ES | [2013/26] | Application number, filing date | 11382397.5 | 23.12.2011 | [2013/26] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2607495 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6858 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6827 (US);
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US);
G01N33/57446 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6858, C12Q2525/161, C12Q2525/191, C12Q2535/137 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erkennung von KRAS-Mutationen | [2013/26] | English: | Method for detection of KRAS mutations | [2013/26] | French: | Procédé de détection des mutations KRAS | [2013/26] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/26] | 03.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9904037 (ZENECA LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1-9 *; | [Y]WO0047766 (ASTRAZENECA UK LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 2 - page 3 * * page 6, line 21 - line 23 * * page 9, line 9 - line 18 ** page 16, line 26 - line 29 *; | [I]US2003175750 (BARANY FRANCIS [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * table 12 * * example 14 * * figures 10,13,35,36,38,39 * * claims 73-78 * * paragraphs [0109] , [0128] , [0238] *; | [I]WO2010048691 (BRITISH COLUMBIA CANCER AGENCY [CA], et al) [I] 1-15 * The whole document, in particular: * * claims 13-16,18-25 * * figures 1-3 * * page 2, line 10 - line 32 * * page 11, line 25 - page 12, line 31 * * table 4 * | by applicant | EP0332435 | WO9904037 | - SHANKARAN ET AL., ONCOLOGIST, (2010), vol. 15, pages 157 - 167 | - ROOCK ET AL., LANCET ONCOL., (2010), vol. 11, pages 753 - 762 | - LOUPAKIS ET AL., BR. J. CANCER, (2009), vol. 101, pages 715 - 721 | - NEWTON ET AL., NUCLEIC ACID RESEARCH, (1989), vol. 17, pages 2503 - 2516 | - YAMADA ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (2005), vol. 113, pages 1015 - 1021 |