EP2474659 - Drum with curved structure for a washing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2019 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: TR | published on 17.07.2019 [2019/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miele & Cie. KG Carl-Miele-Straße 29 33332 Gütersloh / DE | [2012/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bellmann, Heinz-Theo Hesselteicher Str. 67 33428, Harsewinkel / DE | 02 /
Maßmann, Felix Ferdinandstr. 7 59555, Lippstadt / DE | 03 /
Sack, Werner Brunnenstraße 11 33332, Gütersloh / DE | 04 /
Zinkann, Peter Thesings Allee 11a 33332, Gütersloh / DE | [2012/28] | Application number, filing date | 11401007.7 | 11.01.2011 | [2012/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2474659 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2474659 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | D06F37/04 | [2012/28] | CPC: |
D06F37/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/28] | Title | German: | Trommel mit Wölbstruktur für eine Waschmaschine | [2012/28] | English: | Drum with curved structure for a washing machine | [2012/28] | French: | Tambour doté d'une structure bombée pour un lave-linge | [2012/28] | Examination procedure | 13.07.2011 | Examination requested [2012/28] | 21.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/51] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.01.2011 | AL | 09.01.2013 | CY | 09.01.2013 | CZ | 09.01.2013 | DK | 09.01.2013 | EE | 09.01.2013 | FI | 09.01.2013 | HR | 09.01.2013 | LT | 09.01.2013 | LV | 09.01.2013 | MK | 09.01.2013 | MT | 09.01.2013 | NL | 09.01.2013 | RO | 09.01.2013 | RS | 09.01.2013 | SE | 09.01.2013 | SI | 09.01.2013 | SM | 09.01.2013 | IE | 11.01.2013 | LU | 11.01.2013 | BE | 31.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | BG | 09.04.2013 | NO | 09.04.2013 | GR | 10.04.2013 | IS | 09.05.2013 | PT | 09.05.2013 | [2019/29] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 11.01.2011 | |
AL | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MK | 09.01.2013 | ||
MT | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
RS | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SM | 09.01.2013 | ||
TR | 09.01.2013 | ||
IE | 11.01.2013 | ||
LU | 11.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AL | 09.01.2013 | |
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MK | 09.01.2013 | ||
MT | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
RS | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SM | 09.01.2013 | ||
TR | 09.01.2013 | ||
IE | 11.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AL | 09.01.2013 | |
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MT | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
RS | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SM | 09.01.2013 | ||
IE | 11.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AL | 09.01.2013 | |
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MT | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
RS | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
IE | 11.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AL | 09.01.2013 | |
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
RS | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
IE | 11.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | CY | 09.01.2013 | |
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
RS | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
IE | 11.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 09.01.2013 | |
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
RS | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CZ | 09.01.2013 | |
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
RS | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | DK | 09.01.2013 | |
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RS | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/43] | FI | 09.01.2013 | |
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RS | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | FI | 09.01.2013 | |
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | FI | 09.01.2013 | |
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 09.01.2013 | |
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 09.01.2013 | |
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 09.01.2013 | |
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 09.01.2013 | |
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | SI | 09.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0935687 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [AD] 1,4,10,11 * paragraphs [0019] - [0021]; figures 3,3a,4 *; | [A]EP1964960 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1,4,10,11 * paragraphs [0041] - [0048]; figures 3-5 *; | [A]WO2008077394 (MIRTSCH GMBH DR [DE], et al) [A] 1,4,10,11 * page 21, paragraph 4 - page 21, paragraph 1; figures 2-6 *; | [A]EP2177657 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [A] 1,11 * paragraph [0026]; figure 4a *; | [A]DE29705226U (AEG HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,11 * page 2, line 14 - page 3, line 12; figure 2 * | by applicant | EP0935687 | DE10162918 |