EP2525517 - An optical wavelength division multiplex (WDM) transmission system, especially a WDM passive optical network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVA Optical Networking SE Campus Martinsried Fraunhoferstrasse 9 a 82152 Martinsried / München / DE | [2012/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Elbers, Jörg-Peter Lena-Christ-Straße 22 82256 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE | 02 /
Eiselt, Michael An der Gebind 7 99334 Kirchheim / DE | 03 /
Roppelt, Markus Kaiserallee 15a 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | 04 /
Grobe, Klaus Georgenstraße 29 82152 Planegg / DE | [2016/16] |
Former [2012/47] | 01 /
Elbers, Jörg-Peter Lena-Christ-Straße 22 82256 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE | ||
02 /
Eiselt, Micheal An der Gebind 7 99334 Kirchheim / DE | |||
03 /
Roppelt, Markus Kaiserallee 15a 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | |||
04 /
Grobe, Klaus Georgenstraße 29 82152 Planegg / DE | Representative(s) | Eder, Thomas Eder Schieschke & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Elisabethstrasse 34/II 80796 München / DE | [2016/18] |
Former [2012/47] | Eder, Thomas Eder & Schieschke Patentanwälte Elisabethstrasse 34 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11401524.1 | 20.05.2011 | [2012/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2525517 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2525517 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04J14/02 | [2012/47] | CPC: |
H04J14/0227 (EP,US);
H04J14/0278 (EP,US);
H04J14/0246 (EP,US);
H04J14/025 (EP,US);
H04J14/0265 (EP,US);
H04J14/0282 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/18] |
Former [2012/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Optisches Wellenlängenmultiplex-Übertragungssystem, besonders ein passives optisches Wellenlängenmultiplexnetzwerk | [2012/47] | English: | An optical wavelength division multiplex (WDM) transmission system, especially a WDM passive optical network | [2012/47] | French: | Système de transmission en multiplexe de division de longueur d'onde optique, en particulier réseau optique passif WDM | [2012/47] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/27] | 27.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.05.2011 | AL | 04.05.2016 | AT | 04.05.2016 | BE | 04.05.2016 | BG | 04.05.2016 | CY | 04.05.2016 | CZ | 04.05.2016 | DK | 04.05.2016 | EE | 04.05.2016 | ES | 04.05.2016 | FI | 04.05.2016 | HR | 04.05.2016 | IS | 04.05.2016 | IT | 04.05.2016 | LT | 04.05.2016 | LV | 04.05.2016 | MC | 04.05.2016 | MK | 04.05.2016 | NL | 04.05.2016 | PL | 04.05.2016 | RO | 04.05.2016 | RS | 04.05.2016 | SE | 04.05.2016 | SI | 04.05.2016 | SK | 04.05.2016 | SM | 04.05.2016 | TR | 04.05.2016 | IE | 20.05.2016 | LU | 20.05.2016 | CH | 31.05.2016 | LI | 31.05.2016 | MT | 31.05.2016 | FR | 04.07.2016 | NO | 04.08.2016 | GR | 05.08.2016 | PT | 05.09.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 20.05.2011 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
BG | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
TR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IE | 20.05.2016 | ||
LU | 20.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
FR | 04.07.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 20.05.2011 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
TR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IE | 20.05.2016 | ||
LU | 20.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
FR | 04.07.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 20.05.2011 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
TR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IE | 20.05.2016 | ||
LU | 20.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
FR | 04.07.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 20.05.2011 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
IE | 20.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
FR | 04.07.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
IE | 20.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
FR | 04.07.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
FR | 04.07.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/17] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 04.05.2016 | |
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 04.05.2016 | |
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 04.05.2016 | |
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 04.05.2016 | |
NO | 04.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]EP1628423 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [I] 1-3,11-15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0029]; figures 3,4a,4b,5a,5b * [A] 4-10; | [XA] - XINZHU WANG ET AL, "A novel highly reliable WDM-PON system", COMMUNICATIONS AND PHOTONICS CONFERENCE AND EXHIBITION, 2009. ACP 2009. ASIA, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20091102), ISBN 978-1-55752-877-3, pages 1 - 10, XP031623404 [X] 1-7,11-15 * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 3, paragraph 1 * * page 4, paragraph 1 - page 8, paragraph 4; figures 2,3,4,5,6 * [A] 8-10 | [IDA] - KWANIL LEE ET AL, "A self-restorable architecture for bidirectional wavelength-division-multiplexed passive optical network with colorless ONUs", OPTICS EXPRESS, (20070101), vol. 15, no. 8, doi:10.1364/OE.15.004863, ISSN 1094-4087, page 4863, XP055009452 [ID] 1,2,11-15 * the whole document * [A] 3-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.15.004863 | [AD] - CALVIN C K CHAN ET AL, "Novel network architectures for survivable WDM passive optical networks", OPTICAL COMMUNICATION, 2008. ECOC 2008. 34TH EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080921), ISBN 978-1-4244-2227-2, pages 1 - 4, XP031381168 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | - KWANIL LLEE ET AL., "A self-restorable architecture for bidirectional wavelength-division-multiplexed passive optical network with colorless ONUs", OSA OPTICS EPRESS 4863, vol. 15, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1364/OE.15.004863, XP055009452 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.15.004863 | - KWANIL LEE ET AL., "A self-restorable architecture for bidirectional wavelength-division-multiplexed passive optical network with colorless ONUs", OSA OPTICS EPRESS 4863, vol. 15, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1364/OE.15.004863, XP055009452 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.15.004863 |