EP2606769 - Seating furniture with a coupled backrest and seat adjustment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolf Benz AG & Co. KG Haiterbacher Strasse 104 72202 Nagold / DE | [2013/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kummert, Joachim Achalmstr. 27 71159 Mötzingen / DE | [2013/26] | Representative(s) | Späth, Dieter ABACUS Patentanwälte Lise-Meitner-Strasse 21 72202 Nagold / DE | [2013/26] | Application number, filing date | 11401670.2 | 19.12.2011 | [2013/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2606769 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2606769 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A47C1/032 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
A47C1/032 (EP);
A47C7/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/26] | Title | German: | Sitzmöbel mit einer gekoppelten Rückenlehnen- und Sitzverstellung | [2013/26] | English: | Seating furniture with a coupled backrest and seat adjustment | [2013/26] | French: | Siège doté d'un réglage de dossier et de siège couplé | [2013/26] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/26] | 27.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 22.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.12.2011 | AL | 21.08.2013 | BG | 21.08.2013 | CY | 21.08.2013 | CZ | 21.08.2013 | DK | 21.08.2013 | EE | 21.08.2013 | ES | 21.08.2013 | FI | 21.08.2013 | HR | 21.08.2013 | IT | 21.08.2013 | LT | 21.08.2013 | LV | 21.08.2013 | MC | 21.08.2013 | MK | 21.08.2013 | MT | 21.08.2013 | NL | 21.08.2013 | PL | 21.08.2013 | RO | 21.08.2013 | SE | 21.08.2013 | SK | 21.08.2013 | SM | 21.08.2013 | TR | 21.08.2013 | NO | 21.11.2013 | RS | 21.11.2013 | GR | 22.11.2013 | IE | 19.12.2013 | LU | 19.12.2013 | IS | 21.12.2013 | PT | 23.12.2013 | BE | 31.12.2013 | FR | 31.12.2013 | SI | 10.01.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 19.12.2011 | |
BG | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
MK | 21.08.2013 | ||
MT | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
SM | 21.08.2013 | ||
TR | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
RS | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IE | 19.12.2013 | ||
LU | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
SI | 10.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/41] | HU | 19.12.2011 | |
BG | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
MK | 21.08.2013 | ||
MT | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
SM | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
RS | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IE | 19.12.2013 | ||
LU | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
SI | 10.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | HU | 19.12.2011 | |
BG | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
MK | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
SM | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
RS | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IE | 19.12.2013 | ||
LU | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
SI | 10.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 19.12.2011 | |
BG | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
MK | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
SM | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
RS | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IE | 19.12.2013 | ||
LU | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/33] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
MK | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
SM | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IE | 19.12.2013 | ||
LU | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/25] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
SM | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IE | 19.12.2013 | ||
LU | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/21] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IE | 19.12.2013 | ||
LU | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/51] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IE | 19.12.2013 | ||
LU | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IE | 19.12.2013 | ||
LU | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/46] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
LU | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
LU | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | FI | 21.08.2013 | |
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | FI | 21.08.2013 | |
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | HR | 21.08.2013 | |
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 21.08.2013 | |
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 21.08.2013 | |
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 21.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE19627945 (MOEBELBESCHLAEGE GMBH BREITUNG [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-12; | [A]NL1005853C (ERIK JOHANNES RUESSINK [NL]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2844167 (SICHELSCHMIDT STANZWERK [DE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE19580182T |