EP2503078 - Shelter structure, in particular for electrical equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2014 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smitt Technology S.r.l. Traversa di Via Martiri della Libertà, 5 25030 Roncadelle, Brescia / IT | [2012/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tremacchi, Alfredo c/o Smitt Technology S.r.l. Traversa di Via Martiri della Libertà, 5 25030 Roncadelle, Brescia / IT | [2012/39] | Representative(s) | Carangelo, Pierluigi, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza della Vittoria, 11 25122 Brescia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/39] | Carangelo, Pierluigi, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza della Vittoria, 11 25122 Brescia / IT | Application number, filing date | 11425075.6 | 23.03.2011 | [2012/39] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2503078 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E04H1/12, E04H5/04 | [2012/39] | CPC: |
E04H1/1238 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Unterstellstruktur, insbesondere für elektrische Ausrüstung | [2012/39] | English: | Shelter structure, in particular for electrical equipment | [2012/39] | French: | Structure de protection, en particulier pour un équipement électrique | [2012/39] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/18] | 11.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/48] | 16.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.12.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.2013 | 31.03.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE102005009978 (HUXEL RAINER [DE]) [X] 1-3,12,13 * paragraphs [0011] , [0035] , [0061] - [0064] - [0080] , [0086]; figures 1a, 6,7 * [A] 4-8; | [IA]DE3827452 (ALCATEL NV [NL]) [I] 1,2,9,11 * column 3, lines 1-18, 49-53 * * column 5, lines 39-53; figures 1-3,7 * [A] 10,12; | [IDA]WO2007144913 (SMITT CARPENTERIA S R L [IT], et al) [ID] 1-3 * paragraphs [0018] - [0025] - [ 0034]; figures 10a-10h * [A] 12; | [I]DE202010002995U (TEMPLIN GUENTER [DE]) [I] 1,2,9 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2007144913 |