EP2390697 - Connection device for optical fibers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JDM Systems S.R.L. Via Filippo Turati, 55 40134 Bologna (BO) / IT | [2011/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Di Maio, Giovanni c/o JDM Systems S.R.L. Via Filippo Turati, 55 40134 Bologna (BO) / IT | [2011/48] | Representative(s) | Iannone, Carlo Luigi, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/48] | Iannone, Carlo Luigi, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 11425139.0 | 25.05.2011 | [2011/48] | Priority number, date | IT2010RM00283 | 28.05.2010 Original published format: IT RM20100283 | [2011/48] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2390697 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/14, G02B6/38, // G02B6/028 | [2011/48] | CPC: |
G02B6/3825 (EP);
G02B6/14 (EP);
G02B6/44528 (EP);
G02B6/0288 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verbindungsvorrichtung für optischer Fasern | [2011/48] | English: | Connection device for optical fibers | [2011/48] | French: | Dispositif de connexion pour fibres optiques | [2011/48] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/28] | 03.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/21] | 16.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/21] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2004005992 (TYCO ELECTRONICS CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007196053 (KEWITSCH ANTHONY S [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract ** figures 3-5,10,11 * |