EP2570348 - Support unit to connect a ballistic parachute to a helicopter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] | 31.01.2014 | Request for conversion to national application | published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marega Piergiovanni Via Bologna, 107 Torino / IT | [2013/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/12] | Representative(s) | Lovino, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2013/12] | Application number, filing date | 11425237.2 | 19.09.2011 | [2013/12] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2570348 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B64D25/12, B64C27/00 | [2013/12] | CPC: |
B64C27/006 (EP);
B64D25/12 (EP);
B64C27/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Befestigung für einen ballistischen Rettungsfallschirm an einem Helikopter | [2013/12] | English: | Support unit to connect a ballistic parachute to a helicopter | [2013/12] | French: | Unité de support pour fixer un parachute balistique sur un hélicoptère | [2013/12] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/10] | 29.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/10] | 27.12.2013 | Request for conversion into a national application, for IT [2014/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US6199799 (LAI HSING-HSIUNG [TW]) [YD] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE2503461 (KOPPEN WERNER) [Y] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2133365 (SPITZER EGON) [A] 1 * page 2, line 18 - page 3, line 29; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP1160159 (CHIU CHUI WEN [CA]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 23 - column 8, line 21; figures 4-9 *; | [A]US2009127380 (LI HONG-FU [TW]) [A] 1 * page 2, column r, paragraph 44 - page 3, column l, paragraph 46; figures 4,5,10 *; | [A]US2549407 (STEFAN APOSTOLESCU) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE940508 (KARRER PHILIPP) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6199799 |