Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8795123 | Global Dossier | 05.08.2014 | B2 | US2013172143 | 04.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11425316 | 30.12.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101872854B | Global Dossier | 02.07.2018 | B1 | KR20130079132 | 10.07.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | EP11425316 | 30.12.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5985966B | Global Dossier | 06.09.2016 | B2 | JP2013139254 | 18.07.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | EP11425316 | 30.12.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103185108B | Global Dossier | 18.05.2016 | B | CN103185108 | 03.07.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | EP11425316 | 30.12.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2610525 | Global Dossier | 06.09.2017 | B1 | EP2610525 | 03.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11425316 | 30.12.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2606423 | 10.01.2017 | C2 | RU2012154055 | 20.06.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | EP11425316 | 30.12.2011 |