Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
19.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] |
03.10.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.09.2014 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
08.04.2014 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
04.04.2014 | First examination report | |
21.03.2014 | Request for examination filed | published on 23.04.2014 [2014/17] |
19.03.2014 | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
11.11.2013 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
02.10.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.04.2013 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] |
13.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant |