EP2383153 - Retention system for a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.02.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Skoda Auto a.s. Tr. Václava Klementa 869 293 60 Mladá Boleslav / CZ | [2011/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zetková, Dana Spojovací 1000 51801 Dobruska / CZ | 02 /
Mzik, Jirí Hejtmánkovice 107 55001 Hejtmánkovice / CZ | 03 /
Kraus, Ladislav Horní Branná 16 51236 Horní Branná / CZ | [2011/44] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/44] | Application number, filing date | 11466009.5 | 22.04.2011 | [2011/44] | Priority number, date | CZ20100000324 | 29.04.2010 Original published format: CZ 20100324 | [2011/44] | Filing language | CS | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2383153 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2383153 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/06 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
B60R21/06 (EP);
B60R5/047 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Rückhaltesystem für ein Kraftfahrzeug | [2011/44] | English: | Retention system for a motor vehicle | [2011/44] | French: | Système de retenue pour un véhicule automobile | [2011/44] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2012 | Examination requested [2012/52] | 05.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/12] | 12.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.06.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2321436 (AUTOLIV DEV [SE]) [Y] 1-9 * page 16, paragraph 2; figures 2,3,6-12,18 * * page 17, paragraph 3 - page 18, paragraph 2 * * page 20, paragraph 2 *; | [A]JP2000136684 (HAYASHI GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO KK) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE10132080 (BUTZ PETER VERWALTUNG [DE]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [YD]DE10207575 (BUTZ PETER VERWALTUNG [DE]) [YD] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]EP2163436 (SKODA AUTO [CZ]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | DE10207575 |