EP2438832 - Transparent table [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stanek, Miroslav Lucni 1531 69603 Dubnany / SK | [2012/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/15] | Representative(s) | Kendereski, Dusan Koliste 13a 602 00 Brno / CZ | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | Kendereski, Dusan Lidicka 51 602 00 Brno / CZ | Application number, filing date | 11466010.3 | 12.05.2011 | [2012/15] | Priority number, date | CZ20100000366 | 12.05.2010 Original published format: CZ 20100366 | [2012/15] | Filing language | CS | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2438832 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A47B13/12, A47B25/00 | [2012/15] | CPC: |
A47B13/12 (EP);
A47B25/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Transparenter Tisch | [2012/15] | English: | Transparent table | [2012/15] | French: | Table transparente | [2012/15] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/14] | 15.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE924712 (NOEH HANS-JOACHIM) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4175750 (CHESTNUT SCOTT R [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 4 ** column 5, line 34 - line 47 *; | [A]DE202009014132U (WALTER HOLGER [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |