EP2523565 - FROZEN CONFECTIONERY PRODUCT WITH LAYERED STRUCTURE AND APPARATUS FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2016 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [2012/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICCO, Massimilliano Via Campo Bo 46 I-43100 Parma (PR) / IT | 02 /
MARCHON, Jean-Michel 15 rue Jules Ferry F-60000 Beauvais / FR | [2012/47] | Representative(s) | Elleby, Gudrun, et al Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Elleby, Gudrun, et al Nestec S.A. CT-IAM Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | ||
Former [2013/47] | Schuller, Cornelis, et al Nestec S.A. CT-IAM Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | ||
Former [2013/15] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2012/47] | Rossand, Isabelle Nestec S.A. CT-IAM Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Application number, filing date | 11700087.7 | 11.01.2011 | WO2011EP50261 | Priority number, date | EP20100150904 | 15.01.2010 Original published format: EP 10150904 | [2012/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011086058 | Date: | 21.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2523565 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2523565 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A23G9/28, A23G9/48 | [2012/47] | CPC: |
A23G9/48 (EP,US);
A23G9/28 (EP,US);
A23G9/282 (EP,US);
A23G9/283 (EP,US);
A23G9/288 (US);
A23G2200/08 (US);
A23V2002/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEFRORENE SÜßWAREN MIT SCHICHTSTRUKTUR UND HERSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2015/01] | English: | FROZEN CONFECTIONERY PRODUCT WITH LAYERED STRUCTURE AND APPARATUS FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2012/47] | French: | PRODUIT DE CONFISERIE SURGELÉ AVEC STRUCTURE EN COUCHES ET APPAREIL POUR LE FABRIQUER | [2015/01] |
Former [2012/47] | GEFRORENE SÜSSWARE MIT SCHICHTSTRUKTUR UND VORRICHTUNG ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2012/47] | PRODUIT DE CONFISERIE CONGELE A STRUCTURE STRATIFIEE ET SON APPAREIL DE FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/47] | 28.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14187178.0 / EP2845493 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.01.2011 | AL | 06.05.2015 | AT | 06.05.2015 | BE | 06.05.2015 | CY | 06.05.2015 | CZ | 06.05.2015 | DK | 06.05.2015 | EE | 06.05.2015 | HR | 06.05.2015 | LT | 06.05.2015 | LV | 06.05.2015 | MC | 06.05.2015 | MK | 06.05.2015 | NL | 06.05.2015 | PL | 06.05.2015 | RO | 06.05.2015 | RS | 06.05.2015 | SE | 06.05.2015 | SI | 06.05.2015 | SK | 06.05.2015 | SM | 06.05.2015 | TR | 06.05.2015 | BG | 06.08.2015 | NO | 06.08.2015 | IS | 06.09.2015 | PT | 07.09.2015 | IE | 11.01.2016 | LU | 11.01.2016 | MT | 31.01.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 11.01.2011 | |
AT | 06.05.2015 | ||
BE | 06.05.2015 | ||
CY | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
MK | 06.05.2015 | ||
NL | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SE | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
SM | 06.05.2015 | ||
TR | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
IE | 11.01.2016 | ||
LU | 11.01.2016 | ||
MT | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 11.01.2011 | |
AT | 06.05.2015 | ||
BE | 06.05.2015 | ||
CY | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
MK | 06.05.2015 | ||
MT | 06.05.2015 | ||
NL | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SE | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
SM | 06.05.2015 | ||
TR | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
IE | 11.01.2016 | ||
LU | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 11.01.2011 | |
AT | 06.05.2015 | ||
BE | 06.05.2015 | ||
CY | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
MK | 06.05.2015 | ||
MT | 06.05.2015 | ||
NL | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SE | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
SM | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
IE | 11.01.2016 | ||
LU | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
BE | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
MT | 06.05.2015 | ||
NL | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SE | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
IE | 11.01.2016 | ||
LU | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
BE | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
IE | 11.01.2016 | ||
LU | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
BE | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
LU | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
BE | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
LU | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
BE | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | HR | 06.05.2015 | |
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | HR | 06.05.2015 | |
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US1951694 (PRICE GOULSTONE JAMES) [Y] 1-6,8-16,18 * page 1, line 11 - line 73; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2284651 (GUNDLACH GEORGE P, et al) [A] 1,8,10 * page 1, line 32 - line 45; figures 2-6 ** page 2, line 42 - line 56 *; | [Y]JPS5592656 (GIFU SETSUREIKA KK) [Y] 1-18 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0322952 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-3,5,8,10-16,18 * column 1, line 12 - line 18; claims 1,3,5,8,10 * * column 2, line 14 - line 45; figures 4-10 *; | [Y]WO9526640 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 1-6,8-16,18 * page 1, line 34 - page 3, line 4; figure 1; claims 1,2 *; | [YD]US5603965 (DAOUSE ALAIN [FR]) [YD] 1-18 * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 46; figure 2 * * column 5, line 15 - line 25 *; | [A]US2006251783 (D ESPOSITO LUCIO [IT], et al) [A] 1,8,10 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0017]; figure -; claim 1 *; | [Y]EP1980153 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [Y] 1-3,5,8,10-16,18 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0017]; figures 2,4a,3; claims 1,7,8,17,21,22 * | by applicant | EP0221757 | US5135767 | US5283070 | US5603965 |