EP2523980 - METHOD FOR PREPARING POLYETHYLENE WITH HIGH MELT STRENGTH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | For all designated states Dow Brazil S.A. Avenida das Nacoes Unidas 14171 Santo Amaro Cep. 04794-000 Sao Paulo - Sp / BR | [2012/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POLLARD, Maria 3707 Clarestone Drive Pearland TX77584 / US | 02 /
TURNER, Michael 8607 Doves Yard Missouri City TX 77459 / US | 03 /
MAZZOLA, Nicolas Rua Aurora Germano de Lemos 333 Ap94 13209460 Jundiai / BR | 04 /
GOMES, Jorge Rua Gil Eanes 315 AP73 04601040 Sao Paulo / BR | [2012/47] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2012/47] | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 11700714.6 | 11.01.2011 | WO2011US20839 | Priority number, date | US20100685148 | 11.01.2010 Original published format: US 685148 | [2012/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011085371 | Date: | 14.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2523980 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/30, C08F10/02, C08K5/32, C08L23/04, C08J3/22, C08L23/26, // C08F110/02, C08K5/3435, C08L23/08, C08L23/06, C08J5/18 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
C08L23/0815 (EP,KR,US);
C08F8/00 (KR);
B29D7/01 (KR);
C08F10/02 (KR);
C08F110/02 (KR,US);
C08F8/30 (EP,US);
C08J3/226 (EP);
C08J5/18 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/32 (KR);
C08K5/3435 (EP,KR,US);
C08L23/02 (KR);
C08L23/26 (KR);
C08F210/16 (EP);
C08F2500/11 (KR);
C08F2500/12 (KR);
C08F2500/18 (KR);
C08F2810/10 (EP);
C08J2323/08 (EP);
C08J2323/36 (EP,KR,US);
C08J2423/36 (EP);
C08L2205/025 (US);
Y10T428/139 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F8/30, C08F110/02 (US);
C08F8/30, C08F210/16 (EP);
C08L23/0815, C08L23/36, C08L2023/44, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C08F110/02, C08F2500/03, C08F2500/11, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/17 (US); |
Former IPC [2012/47] | C08F8/00, C08F10/02, C08K5/32, C08L23/26, C08L23/04, C08F8/30, C08K5/3435, C08F210/16, C08F110/02, C08J3/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYETHYLEN MIT HOHER SCHMELZFESTIGKEIT | [2020/04] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARING POLYETHYLENE WITH HIGH MELT STRENGTH | [2012/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE POLYÉTHYLÈNE À HAUTE RÉSISTANCE À L'ÉTAT FONDU | [2020/04] |
Former [2012/47] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYETHYLEN MIT HOHER SCHMEZFESTIGKEIT | ||
Former [2012/47] | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉLABORATION DE POLYÉTHYLÈNE À HAUTE RÉSISTANCE À L'ÉTAT FONDU | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/47] | 06.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/48] | 07.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2008146740 (ROTH MICHAEL [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0641] - [0644] * * examples A20, A44; claim - * * table 1, compounds 120 and 144 ** paragraph [0638]; table 11 *; | [I] - SCAFFARO R ET AL, "On the effectiveness of different additives and concentrations on the re-building of the molecular structure of degraded polyethylene", POLYMER DEGRADATION AND STABILITY, BARKING, GB, vol. 91, no. 12, doi:10.1016/J.POLYMDEGRADSTAB.2006.07.022, ISSN 0141-3910, (20061201), pages 3110 - 3116, (20061201), XP025095966 [I] 1-20 * abstract * * page 3111, column L, paragraph 3 - page 3116, column R, paragraph 4 * * scheme 3 * * figures 1-6,8; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.polymdegradstab.2006.07.022 | [I] - SCAFFARO R ET AL, "Effect of the additive level and of the processing temperature on the re-building of post-consumer pipes from polyethylene blends", EUROPEAN POLYMER JOURNAL JULY 2007 ELSEVIER LTD; ELSEVIER ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY; THE BOULEVARD GB,, (20070701), vol. 43, no. 7, pages 2947 - 2955, XP002633405 [I] 1-20 * abstract * * page 2948, column R, paragraph 2 - page 2955, column L, paragraph 3 * * figures 1-5; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.eurpolymj.2007.04.027 | [I] - LA MANTIA F P ET AL, "Processability and properties of re-graded, photo-oxidized post-consumer greenhouse films", MACROMOLECULAR MATERIALS AND ENGINEERING 20051020 WILEY-VCH VERLAG DE,, (20051020), vol. 290, no. 10, pages 970 - 975, XP002633361 [I] 1-20 * page 971, column L, paragraph 3 - page 975 * * figures 1-3,5,6; tables 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mame.200500180 | [I] - LA MANTIA F P ET AL, "Re-gradation of photo-oxidized post-consumer greenhouse films", MACROMOLECULAR RAPID COMMUNICATIONS 20050304 WILEY-VCH VERLAG DE, (20050304), vol. 26, no. 5, doi:10.1002/MARC.200400534, pages 361 - 364, XP002633780 [I] 1-20 * the whole document * * figures 1-2; tables 1-2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/marc.200400534 | [L] - REACH EN CLP STOFFENCHECKER, "Octadecanoic acid, [9-acetyloxy)-3,8,10-triethyl-7,8,10-trimethyl-1,5 dioxa-9-azaspiro[5.5]undec-3-yl]methyl ester", INTERNET CITATION, (20091216), URL: http://webcache.googleusercontent.com/search?hl=de&q=cache:AGlpZ0AN6ygJ:http://reachstoffenchecker.sdu.nl/stoffenchecker/gesloten/toonstof.asp?RootID=936023+CGX+CR946&ct=clnk, (20110415), XP002633360 [L] * the whole document * | by applicant | US2008146740 | - POLYMER DEGRADATION AND STABILITY, (2006), vol. 91, pages 3110 - 3116 | - EUROPEAN POLYMER JOURNAL, (2007), vol. 43, pages 2947 - 2955 | - MARCROMOLECULAR MATERIALS AND ENGINEERING, (2005), vol. 290, pages 970 - 975 | - MARCROMOLECULAR RAPID COMMUNICATIONS, (2005), vol. 26, pages 361 - 364 |