EP2525851 - CODED CARTRIDGE HOLDER AND FASTENER ENABLED BY CARTRIDGE SIZE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstraße 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2019/19] |
Former [2012/48] | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstraße 50 65929 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLUMPTRE, David 36 Shire Way Droitwich Spa Worcestershire WR9 7RQ / GB | 02 /
LANGLEY, Christopher Nigel 120 Leicester Lane Leamington Spa Warwickshire CV32 7HH / GB | 03 /
AVERY, Richard James Vincent 28 Nursery Close Mickleton Chipping Campden Gloucestershire GL55 6TX / GB | 04 /
Butler, Joseph 6 Hadfield Close Clifton Rugby Warwickshire CV23 0DL / GB | [2012/48] | Representative(s) | Weilnau, Carsten, et al Patentanwälte Sturm Weilnau Franke Partnerschaft mbB Unter den Eichen 5 (Haus C-Süd) 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/19] | Weilnau, Carsten, et al Quermann - Sturm - Weilnau Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unter den Eichen 5 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2012/48] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 11701084.3 | 21.01.2011 | [2019/19] | WO2011EP50799 | Priority number, date | EP20100160873 | 23.04.2010 Original published format: EP 10160873 | US20100297611P | 22.01.2010 Original published format: US 297611 P | [2012/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011089207 | Date: | 28.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2525851 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2525851 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/31, A61M5/24 | [2018/52] | CPC: |
A61M5/24 (EP,US);
F16L55/00 (US);
A61M2005/2407 (EP,US);
A61M2005/2488 (EP,US);
A61M2005/2492 (EP,US);
A61M2205/276 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/34] | A61M5/31, F16L55/00, A61M5/24 | ||
Former IPC [2012/48] | A61M5/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/48] | Extension states | BA | 22.08.2012 | ME | 22.08.2012 | Title | German: | CODIERTER KASSETTENHALTER UND ÜBER KASSETTENGRÖSSE AKTIVIERTER FIXIERER | [2012/48] | English: | CODED CARTRIDGE HOLDER AND FASTENER ENABLED BY CARTRIDGE SIZE | [2012/48] | French: | PORTE-CARTOUCHE CODÉ ET ÉLÉMENT DE FIXATION ACTIVÉ PAR LA TAILLE DE LA CARTOUCHE | [2012/48] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/48] | 21.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19166446.5 / EP3539595 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.01.2011 | AL | 08.05.2019 | AT | 08.05.2019 | CY | 08.05.2019 | CZ | 08.05.2019 | EE | 08.05.2019 | ES | 08.05.2019 | FI | 08.05.2019 | HR | 08.05.2019 | IT | 08.05.2019 | LT | 08.05.2019 | LV | 08.05.2019 | MC | 08.05.2019 | MK | 08.05.2019 | MT | 08.05.2019 | NL | 08.05.2019 | PL | 08.05.2019 | RO | 08.05.2019 | RS | 08.05.2019 | SE | 08.05.2019 | SI | 08.05.2019 | SK | 08.05.2019 | SM | 08.05.2019 | BG | 08.08.2019 | NO | 08.08.2019 | GR | 09.08.2019 | IS | 08.09.2019 | PT | 08.09.2019 | IE | 21.01.2020 | LU | 21.01.2020 | BE | 31.01.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 21.01.2011 | |
AL | 08.05.2019 | ||
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
MT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
IS | 08.09.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
IE | 21.01.2020 | ||
LU | 21.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 21.01.2011 | |
AL | 08.05.2019 | ||
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
MT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
IE | 21.01.2020 | ||
LU | 21.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
IE | 21.01.2020 | ||
LU | 21.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
LU | 21.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
LU | 21.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB680224 (ADRIAN HILTON ELLAM) [X] 1,14 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [X]US3811441 (SARNOFF S) [X] 1,11,14 * figures 1-3 *; | [X]US4585445 (HADTKE FREDERICK B [US]) [X] 1,11,14 * abstract *; | [X]EP0485028 (STERLING WINTHROP INC [US]) [X] 1,11,14 * abstract *; | [X]WO9730741 (SANOFI WINTHROP INC [US]) [X] 1,11,14 * abstract *; | [A]WO03017915 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]US2007021718 (BURREN STEFAN [CH], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [X]WO2008062025 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-7,14,15 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2008074897 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-7,14,15 * the whole document * | Examination | US2007021718 | WO2008062025 | WO2008074897 |