|
03.01.2019 |
Acknowledgement of withdrawal of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2018 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2018 |
Withdrawal of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2018 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.09.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
25.09.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.03.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.11.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.11.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.07.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.07.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.07.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.07.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.05.2017 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2016 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2016 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2016 |
Deficiencies in an enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2016 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2014 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2014 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2013 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.05.2013 |
Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2013 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.2013 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.01.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.01.2013 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
11.01.2013 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
11.01.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.09.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.2012 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.08.2012 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
11.06.2012 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.03.2012 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.10.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.10.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.10.2011 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
04.08.2011 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
13.01.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
13.01.2011 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
13.01.2011 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
13.01.2011 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
18 |
|
13.01.2011 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
7 |