21.12.2018 |
Withdrawal of application |
published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] |
18.12.2018 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
24.09.2018 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
06.03.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.01.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.12.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.07.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.05.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.05.2017 |
First examination report |
|
18.01.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.01.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.01.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.04.2013 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
05.04.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.04.2013 |
Change - extension states |
published on 08.05.2013 [2013/19] |
01.03.2013 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
15.01.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
09.11.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] |
09.11.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] |
05.09.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.09.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.10.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.09.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.08.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.08.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|