Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2531822 | Global Dossier | 12.12.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP50372 | 13.01.2011 | DE102010001440 | 01.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2787896 | 21.07.2015 | C | CA2787896 | 04.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP50372 | 13.01.2011 | DE102010001440 | 01.02.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011092056 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2011 | A3 | WO2011092056 | 04.08.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102010001440 | 01.02.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102010001440 | 16.01.2014 | B4 | DE102010001440 | 04.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102010001440 | 01.02.2010 |