EP2531822 - METHOD FOR MEASURING THE WATER LEVEL OF A BODY OF WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsches Zentrum für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V. Linder Höhe 51147 Köln / DE | [2012/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EINEDER, Michael Pfingstrosenstrasse 63 B 81377 München / DE | [2012/50] | Representative(s) | Fink Numrich Patentanwälte PartmbB Paul-Gerhardt-Allee 24 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/50] | Fink Numrich Patentanwälte European Patent and Trademark Attorneys Wendl-Dietrich-Straße 14 D-80634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11701634.5 | 13.01.2011 | WO2011EP50372 | Priority number, date | DE20101001440 | 01.02.2010 Original published format: DE102010001440 | [2012/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011092056 | Date: | 04.08.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2531822 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01F23/00 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
H01Q1/225 (EP);
G01F23/284 (EP);
G01S13/88 (EP);
H01Q1/28 (EP);
H01Q1/34 (EP);
H01Q15/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG DES WASSERSTANDS EINES GEWÄSSERS | [2012/50] | English: | METHOD FOR MEASURING THE WATER LEVEL OF A BODY OF WATER | [2012/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE LA PROFONDEUR D'UNE NAPPE D'EAU | [2012/50] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/50] | 11.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/04] | 18.12.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.05.2019 | 21.05.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.05.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.03.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US4184155 (SILVERTSON WILFORD E JR [US]) [X] 1-3,12 * the whole document * [A] 4-11,13; | [YA]US4914734 (LOVE ROBERT J [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-5,12,13 * column 9, line 5 - line 60; figure 7 * [A] 6-11; | [YA]DE2461945 (COMMW OF AUSTRALIA) [Y] 1-5,12-17 * page 22; figure 17 * [A] 6-11; | [A]US2823365 (HARVEY RINES ROBERT) [A] 1-17 * column 3, line 45 - line 55; figure 1 *; | [A]US3258737 (RODOLPH J. CIAVAGLIA) [A] 1-17 * column 3, line 25 - line 30; figure 2 *; | [XA]DE102008029771 (ENDRESS & HAUSER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,14,16 * the whole document * [A] 2-13,17 | [YA] - Gong Lixia ET AL, "Detection of artificial corner reflector on SAR images", Proc. Dragon 1 Programme Final Results 2004-2007, (20080101), URL: http://earth.eo.esa.int/dragon/symp2008/proceedings/39Gong.pdf, (20110712), XP055002661 [Y] 1-5,12-17 * the whole document * [A] 6-11 | Examination | DE889617 | JP2001177335 | by applicant | - HONG, S.-H.; WDOWINSKI, S.; KIM, S.-W., "Evaluation of TerraSAR-X Observations for Wetland InSAR Application", GEOSCIENCE AND REMOTE SENSING, IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON : ACCEPTED FOR FUTURE PUBLICATION |