EP2531685 - MOTOR-DRIVEN FITTING FOR A SLIDING DOOR CABINET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.2020 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sliding Competence Center Kft. Hengersor Utca 30 1184 Budapest / HU | [2017/27] |
Former [2012/50] | For all designated states Weber & Co. GmbH KG Industriestrasse 59 42551 Velbert / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LÖHR, Uwe Bachstraße 6 42579 Heiligenhaus / DE | [2012/50] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [2019/15] |
Former [2014/11] | Rank, Christoph, et al Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 D-70565 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2012/50] | Grundmann, Dirk, et al RIEDER & PARTNER Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Postfach 11 04 51 42304 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 11702185.7 | 02.02.2011 | [2019/15] | WO2011EP51451 | Priority number, date | DE20101016040 | 19.03.2010 Original published format: DE102010016040 | DE20101000313 | 05.02.2010 Original published format: DE102010000313 | [2012/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011095507 | Date: | 11.08.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2531685 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2531685 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/643 | [2018/38] | CPC: |
E05F15/643 (EP);
E05F15/652 (EP);
E05Y2900/20 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/50] | E05F15/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOTORBETRIEBENER BESCHLAG FÜR EINEN SCHIEBETÜRSCHRANK | [2012/50] | English: | MOTOR-DRIVEN FITTING FOR A SLIDING DOOR CABINET | [2012/50] | French: | FERRURE MOTORISÉE POUR ARMOIRE À PORTES COULISSANTES | [2012/50] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2012 | Examination requested [2012/50] | 11.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.02.2011 | AL | 10.04.2019 | CY | 10.04.2019 | CZ | 10.04.2019 | DK | 10.04.2019 | EE | 10.04.2019 | ES | 10.04.2019 | FI | 10.04.2019 | HR | 10.04.2019 | LT | 10.04.2019 | LV | 10.04.2019 | MC | 10.04.2019 | MK | 10.04.2019 | MT | 10.04.2019 | NL | 10.04.2019 | RO | 10.04.2019 | RS | 10.04.2019 | SE | 10.04.2019 | SI | 10.04.2019 | SK | 10.04.2019 | SM | 10.04.2019 | TR | 10.04.2019 | BG | 10.07.2019 | NO | 10.07.2019 | GR | 11.07.2019 | IS | 10.08.2019 | PT | 10.09.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 02.02.2011 | |
AL | 10.04.2019 | ||
CY | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
MT | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 10.04.2019 | |
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 10.04.2019 | |
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | NL | 10.04.2019 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0690245 (CONTINENTAL AG [DE]) [Y] 8 * the whole document *; | [IA]EP1431499 (AGTA RECORD AG [CH]) [I] 6,7 * paragraphs [0018] - [0021] * * figures 1,2,4 * [A] 1,10; | [IY]US2005150168 (ROMERO FEDERICO [US], et al) [I] 1-7,9-11 * paragraphs [0019] , [0026] , [0027] * * figures 2,5 * [Y] 8; | [A]WO2006013461 (HANCOCK DARREN [AU], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 12, line 22 - page 13, line 3 ** figure 1 *; | [A]EP1854957 (AMER SPA [IT]) [A] 1,5,7,9,10 * paragraphs [0014] - [0016] - [0020] - [0022] - [0025] - [0027] - [0034] , [0037] * * figures 2,3,6,9 * | by applicant | DE9105187U | DE20201094U | EP1431499 | US2005150168 | DE102005024654 | EP1854957 | DE102006049479 | DE102007046172 |