EP2534652 - COLOUR CALIBRATION OF ELECTRONIC DISPLAY SCREENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2015 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo Nobel Coatings International B.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [2012/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIRCHNER, Eric Jacob Jan Wollegras 14 NL-2318 TG Leiden / NL | 02 /
VAN DER LANS, Ivo Bernardus Nicolaas Drogerij 19 NL-2635 GM Den Hoorn / NL | 03 /
NJO, Swie Lan Marelaan 26 NL-2341 LD Oegstgeest / NL | 04 /
HALF, André Deken Waarestraat 58 NL-1943 JX Beverwijk / NL | 05 /
GOTTENBOS, Roelof Johannes Baptist Muzenlaan 90 NL-2353 KG Leiderdorp / NL | [2012/51] | Representative(s) | Akzo Nobel IP Department Christian Neefestraat 2 1077 WW Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Akzo Nobel IP Department Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [2012/51] | De Vries, Adriaan Jacobus Akzo Nobel N.V. Legal, IP & Compliance P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | Application number, filing date | 11702466.1 | 10.02.2011 | WO2011EP51921 | Priority number, date | US20100303768P | 12.02.2010 Original published format: US 303768 P | EP20100153397 | 12.02.2010 Original published format: EP 10153397 | [2012/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011098502 | Date: | 18.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2534652 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G09G5/02 | [2012/51] | CPC: |
G09G5/02 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0606 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0666 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/51] | Title | German: | FARBKALIBRIERUNG VON ELEKTRONISCHEN ANZEIGEBILDSCHIRMEN | [2012/51] | English: | COLOUR CALIBRATION OF ELECTRONIC DISPLAY SCREENS | [2012/51] | French: | ETALONNAGE DE COULEURS D'ÉCRANS À AFFICHAGE ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2012/51] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/51] | 12.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/21] | 14.04.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.05.2015 | 19.05.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.06.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE19755655 (LOGO KOMMUNIKATIONS UND DRUCKT [DE]) [Y] 1,2,4-6,8 * column 1, line 3 - column 3, line 10 *; | [Y]US5670985 (CAPPELS SR RICHARD D [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,5,6,8-10 * column 3, line 53 - column 17, line 42; figures 1-9 *; | [Y]US5956015 (HINO MAKOTO [JP]) [Y] 1-3,5-8 * column 6, line 15 - column 9, line 37; figures 4-8 *; | [Y]US5786803 (HERNANDEZ MATHEW [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5,6,8 * column 4, line 32 - column 20, line 23; figures 1-15c *; | [Y]EP1137294 (COMPAQ COMPUTER CORP [US]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0017]; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | WO2007127057 | US5956015 | - R.S. BERNS, Billmeyer and Saltzmann's Principles of Color Technology, WILEY-INTERSCIENCE, (2000), page 222 |