EP2534040 - BOW LOADING STATION WITH DOUBLE DECK FOR CRYOGENIC FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.12.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Single Buoy Moorings, Inc. Route de Fribourg 5 1723 Marly / CH | [2012/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOURNIER, Jean-Robert 25 rue Smolett F-06300 Nice / FR | 02 /
HOEDEMAKER, Priscilla 427 Chemin de Vosgelade F-06140 Vence / FR | 03 /
LE TOUZÉ, Laurent 31 rue Lepante F-06300 Nice / FR | [2012/51] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2013/28] |
Former [2012/51] | Ketelaars, Maarten F.J.M. Nederlandsch Octrooibureau J.W. Frisolaan 13 2517 JS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 11702475.2 | 10.02.2011 | [2018/20] | WO2011EP51976 | Priority number, date | EP20100153175 | 10.02.2010 Original published format: EP 10153175 | [2012/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011098527 | Date: | 18.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2534040 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2534040 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B63B27/30 | [2012/51] | CPC: |
B63B27/24 (EP);
B63B27/30 (EP);
B63B1/063 (EP);
Y02T70/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BUGBELADUNGSSTATION MIT DOPPELDECK FÜR KRYOFLÜSSIGKEIT | [2012/51] | English: | BOW LOADING STATION WITH DOUBLE DECK FOR CRYOGENIC FLUID | [2012/51] | French: | STATION DE CHARGEMENT AVANT À DOUBLE PONT POUR LIQUIDE CRYOGÉNIQUE | [2012/51] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/51] | 24.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 19.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/17] | Request for further processing for: | 19.06.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 19.06.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.09.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.02.2011 | AL | 16.05.2018 | AT | 16.05.2018 | CY | 16.05.2018 | CZ | 16.05.2018 | DK | 16.05.2018 | EE | 16.05.2018 | ES | 16.05.2018 | FI | 16.05.2018 | HR | 16.05.2018 | LT | 16.05.2018 | LV | 16.05.2018 | MC | 16.05.2018 | MK | 16.05.2018 | NL | 16.05.2018 | PL | 16.05.2018 | RO | 16.05.2018 | RS | 16.05.2018 | SE | 16.05.2018 | SI | 16.05.2018 | SK | 16.05.2018 | SM | 16.05.2018 | TR | 16.05.2018 | BG | 16.08.2018 | GR | 17.08.2018 | IS | 16.09.2018 | PT | 17.09.2018 | GB | 10.02.2019 | IE | 10.02.2019 | LU | 10.02.2019 | MT | 10.02.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 10.02.2011 | |
AL | 16.05.2018 | ||
AT | 16.05.2018 | ||
CY | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IS | 16.09.2018 | ||
PT | 17.09.2018 | ||
GB | 10.02.2019 | ||
IE | 10.02.2019 | ||
LU | 10.02.2019 | ||
MT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 16.05.2018 | |
AT | 16.05.2018 | ||
CY | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IS | 16.09.2018 | ||
PT | 17.09.2018 | ||
GB | 10.02.2019 | ||
IE | 10.02.2019 | ||
LU | 10.02.2019 | ||
MT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 16.05.2018 | |
AT | 16.05.2018 | ||
CY | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
PT | 17.09.2018 | ||
GB | 10.02.2019 | ||
IE | 10.02.2019 | ||
LU | 10.02.2019 | ||
MT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 16.05.2018 | |
AT | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
PT | 17.09.2018 | ||
GB | 10.02.2019 | ||
IE | 10.02.2019 | ||
LU | 10.02.2019 | ||
MT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 16.05.2018 | |
AT | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
GB | 10.02.2019 | ||
IE | 10.02.2019 | ||
LU | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 16.05.2018 | |
AT | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
GB | 10.02.2019 | ||
IE | 10.02.2019 | ||
LU | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 16.05.2018 | |
AT | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IE | 10.02.2019 | ||
LU | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 16.05.2018 | |
AT | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
LU | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
LU | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 16.05.2018 | |
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 16.05.2018 | |
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3540400 (BOSTON ROBERT S, et al) [Y] 4 * abstract *; | [Y]WO0002773 (MARITIME PUSNES AS [NO], et al) [Y] 1-18 * abstract * * page 2, lines 6-263 *; | [A]US2002134455 (EMBLEM ROLF [NO], et al) [A] 1* figure 5 *; | [Y]US2008148740 (HARTONO JOHN S [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * paragraph [0036] *; | [Y]WO2009071563 (SINGLE BUOY MOORINGS [CH], et al) [Y] 1,2,4-6,8-18 * figures 1-3,5b,8 * | by applicant | US6434948 |